This case was last updated from Onondaga County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 22:27:45 (UTC).

NEDRA M MADERA - v. - CHUNG XING INC.

Case Summary

On 06/20/2017 NEDRA M MADERA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CHUNG XING INC. This case was filed in Onondaga County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2588

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Onondaga County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Onondaga, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nedra M Madera as Administratrix of the Estate of Toni Phoenix, Deceased

Defendant

CHUNG XING INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LISSAUER, LAWRENCE D

Attorney at FINKELSTEIN & PARTNERS

 

Court Documents

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 02/03/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Mailing judgment upon Defendant's Insurance Company

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Mailing judgment upon Defendant's Insurance Company; Filed By: Lissauer, L. - filed by Sheehan Maines, K.; Filed: 08/22/2019; Received: 08/22/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY

NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Lissauer, L. - filed by Sheehan Maines, K.; Filed: 08/20/2019; Received: 08/20/2019

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/16/2019; Received: 08/19/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Lissauer, L. - filed by Sheehan Maines, K.; Filed: 07/24/2019; Received: 07/24/2019

JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) *Corrected*

JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) *Corrected*; Filed By: Lissauer, L. - filed by Sheehan Maines, K.; Filed: 07/24/2019; Received: 07/25/2019

DECISION/ORDER AFTER INQUEST Decision on Inquest by submission

DECISION/ORDER AFTER INQUEST Decision on Inquest by submission; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/24/2019; Received: 07/23/2019

TRIAL DOCUMENTS Copy of Letter from Office of Medicaid Inspector General

TRIAL DOCUMENTS Copy of Letter from Office of Medicaid Inspector General; Filed By: Lissauer, L. - filed by Finkelstein & Partners, LLP; Filed: 06/05/2019; Received: 06/05/2019

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Supplemental Letter to Hon James P Murphy

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Supplemental Letter to Hon James P Murphy; Filed By: Lissauer, L. - filed by Finkelstein & Partners, LLP; Filed: 06/05/2019; Received: 06/05/2019

AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) Affirmation

AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) Affirmation; Filed By: Lissauer, L. - filed by Finkelstein & Partners, LLP; Filed: 09/24/2018; Received: 09/24/2018

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion; Filed By: Lissauer, L. - filed by Finkelstein & Partners, LLP; Filed: 09/24/2018; Received: 09/24/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of ASC and Notice of Commencement of Action Subject to Efiling on deft.

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of ASC and Notice of Commencement of Action Subject to Efiling on deft.; Filed By: Lissauer, L. - filed by D'Onofrio, L.; Filed: 05/07/2018; Received: 05/07/2018

COMPLAINT (AMENDED) Amended Complaint reflecting the Admin, dated April 11, 2018

COMPLAINT (AMENDED) Amended Complaint reflecting the Admin, dated April 11, 2018; Filed By: Lissauer, L. - filed by D'Onofrio, L.; Filed: 04/16/2018; Received: 04/16/2018

SUMMONS (PRE RJI) (AMENDED) Amended Summons to reflect Admin, dated April 11, 2018

SUMMONS (PRE RJI) (AMENDED) Amended Summons to reflect Admin, dated April 11, 2018; Filed By: Lissauer, L. - filed by D'Onofrio, L.; Filed: 04/16/2018; Received: 04/16/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE Proof of Notification to NYS DOH pursuant to CPLR 306-c

PROOF OF SERVICE Proof of Notification to NYS DOH pursuant to CPLR 306-c; Filed By: Lissauer, L. - filed by D'Onofrio, L.; Filed: 08/09/2017; Received: 08/09/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of S&C and Notice of Commencement of Action Subject to Efiling on deft.

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of S&C and Notice of Commencement of Action Subject to Efiling on deft.; Filed By: Lissauer, L. - filed by D'Onofrio, L.; Filed: 07/17/2017; Received: 07/17/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Statement of Authorization for Efiling, dated June 20, 2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Statement of Authorization for Efiling, dated June 20, 2017; Filed By: Lissauer, L. - filed by D'Onofrio, L.; Filed: 06/20/2017; Received: 06/20/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Complaint, dated June 15, 2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Complaint, dated June 15, 2017; Filed By: Lissauer, L. - filed by D'Onofrio, L.; Filed: 06/20/2017; Received: 06/20/2017

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 02/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Mailing judgment upon Defendant's Insurance Company; Filed By: Lissauer, L. - filed by Sheehan Maines, K.; Filed: 08/22/2019; Received: 08/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Lissauer, L. - filed by Sheehan Maines, K.; Filed: 08/20/2019; Received: 08/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • DocketJUDGMENT - SIGNED BY COURT TO COUNTY CLERK (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/19/2019; Received: 08/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/16/2019; Received: 08/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Lissauer, L. - filed by Sheehan Maines, K.; Filed: 07/24/2019; Received: 07/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) *Corrected*; Filed By: Lissauer, L. - filed by Sheehan Maines, K.; Filed: 07/24/2019; Received: 07/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION/ORDER AFTER INQUEST Decision on Inquest by submission; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/24/2019; Received: 07/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRIAL DOCUMENTS Copy of Letter from Office of Medicaid Inspector General; Filed By: Lissauer, L. - filed by Finkelstein & Partners, LLP; Filed: 06/05/2019; Received: 06/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Supplemental Letter to Hon James P Murphy; Filed By: Lissauer, L. - filed by Finkelstein & Partners, LLP; Filed: 06/05/2019; Received: 06/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Madera Affidavit; Filed By: Lissauer, L. - filed by Finkelstein & Partners, LLP; Filed: 09/24/2018; Received: 09/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #1) Affirmation; Filed By: Lissauer, L. - filed by Finkelstein & Partners, LLP; Filed: 09/24/2018; Received: 09/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion; Filed By: Lissauer, L. - filed by Finkelstein & Partners, LLP; Filed: 09/24/2018; Received: 09/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of ASC and Notice of Commencement of Action Subject to Efiling on deft.; Filed By: Lissauer, L. - filed by D'Onofrio, L.; Filed: 05/07/2018; Received: 05/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT (AMENDED) Amended Complaint reflecting the Admin, dated April 11, 2018; Filed By: Lissauer, L. - filed by D'Onofrio, L.; Filed: 04/16/2018; Received: 04/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS (PRE RJI) (AMENDED) Amended Summons to reflect Admin, dated April 11, 2018; Filed By: Lissauer, L. - filed by D'Onofrio, L.; Filed: 04/16/2018; Received: 04/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE Proof of Notification to NYS DOH pursuant to CPLR 306-c; Filed By: Lissauer, L. - filed by D'Onofrio, L.; Filed: 08/09/2017; Received: 08/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of S&C and Notice of Commencement of Action Subject to Efiling on deft.; Filed By: Lissauer, L. - filed by D'Onofrio, L.; Filed: 07/17/2017; Received: 07/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Statement of Authorization for Efiling, dated June 20, 2017; Filed By: Lissauer, L. - filed by D'Onofrio, L.; Filed: 06/20/2017; Received: 06/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Complaint, dated June 15, 2017; Filed By: Lissauer, L. - filed by D'Onofrio, L.; Filed: 06/20/2017; Received: 06/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less