This case was last updated from Albany County Courts on 05/08/2020 at 17:53:26 (UTC).

NBT Bank, National Association - v. - Louvenia Harrison

Case Summary

On 08/24/2018 NBT Bank, National Association filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Louvenia Harrison. This case was filed in Albany County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Gerard E Maney. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0-18

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Albany, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Gerard E Maney

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NBT BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendant

Louvenia Harrison

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEVINE, LOUIS

Attorney at MELVIN & MELVIN

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 12/26/2019; Received: 12/26/2019

ORDER - OTHER contempt order-entered by the clerk

ORDER - OTHER contempt order-entered by the clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/19/2019; Received: 11/19/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 6 (Motion #2) Questionnaire

EXHIBIT(S) - 6 (Motion #2) Questionnaire; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 09/25/2019; Received: 09/25/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 5 (Motion #2) Letter

EXHIBIT(S) - 5 (Motion #2) Letter; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 09/25/2019; Received: 09/25/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #2) Certified Green Card

EXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #2) Certified Green Card; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 09/25/2019; Received: 09/25/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #2) Information Subpoena

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #2) Information Subpoena; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 09/25/2019; Received: 09/25/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #2) Restraining Notice

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #2) Restraining Notice; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 09/25/2019; Received: 09/25/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #2) Note Of Issue

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #2) Note Of Issue; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 09/25/2019; Received: 09/25/2019

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #2) Affidavit of Service by Mail of Motion

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #2) Affidavit of Service by Mail of Motion; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 09/25/2019; Received: 09/25/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #1) Non-Military Affidavit

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #1) Non-Military Affidavit; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 01/28/2019; Received: 01/28/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #1) Proof of Service

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #1) Proof of Service; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 01/28/2019; Received: 01/28/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #1) Affidavit of Mailing

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #1) Affidavit of Mailing; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 01/28/2019; Received: 01/28/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS (Motion #1); Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 01/28/2019; Received: 01/28/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1); Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 01/28/2019; Received: 01/28/2019

EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1)

EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1); Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 01/28/2019; Received: 01/28/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 12/13/2018; Received: 12/13/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - A Contract

EXHIBIT(S) - A Contract; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 08/24/2018; Received: 08/24/2018

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 08/24/2018; Received: 08/24/2018

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 12/26/2019; Received: 12/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER contempt order-entered by the clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/19/2019; Received: 11/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 6 (Motion #2) Questionnaire; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 09/25/2019; Received: 09/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 5 (Motion #2) Letter; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 09/25/2019; Received: 09/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #2) Certified Green Card; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 09/25/2019; Received: 09/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #2) Information Subpoena; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 09/25/2019; Received: 09/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #2) Restraining Notice; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 09/25/2019; Received: 09/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #2) Note Of Issue; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 09/25/2019; Received: 09/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #2) Affidavit of Service by Mail of Motion; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 09/25/2019; Received: 09/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #2) Affidavit of Service by Mail of Information Subpoena; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 09/25/2019; Received: 09/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #1) Contract; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 01/28/2019; Received: 01/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #1) Non-Military Affidavit; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 01/28/2019; Received: 01/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #1) Proof of Service; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 01/28/2019; Received: 01/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #1) Affidavit of Mailing; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 01/28/2019; Received: 01/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS (Motion #1); Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 01/28/2019; Received: 01/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1); Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 01/28/2019; Received: 01/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1); Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 01/28/2019; Received: 01/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 12/13/2018; Received: 12/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Contract; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 08/24/2018; Received: 08/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 08/24/2018; Received: 08/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less