This case was last updated from Jefferson County New York Courts on 07/24/2023 at 21:54:09 (UTC).

NBT Bank, National Association v. Julia Smith

Case Summary

On 08/14/2020 NBT Bank, National Association filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Julia Smith. This case was filed in Jefferson County New York Courts, Supreme Court located in Jefferson, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is James P Mcclusky. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********1315

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Jefferson, New York

Judge Details

Judge

James P Mcclusky

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NBT Bank, National Association

Defendant

Julia Smith

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEVINE, LOUIS

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 08/14/2020; Received: 08/14/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - A Contract

EXHIBIT(S) - A Contract; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 08/14/2020; Received: 08/14/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 09/01/2020; Received: 09/01/2020

EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1)

EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1); Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 02/26/2021; Received: 02/26/2021

AFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES (Motion #1)

AFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES (Motion #1); Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 02/26/2021; Received: 02/26/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) SC

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) SC; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 02/26/2021; Received: 02/26/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) contract

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) contract; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 02/26/2021; Received: 02/26/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) AOS

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) AOS; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 02/26/2021; Received: 02/26/2021

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) 3215

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) 3215; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 02/26/2021; Received: 02/26/2021

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) non military

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) non military; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 02/26/2021; Received: 02/26/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) military search

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) military search; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 02/26/2021; Received: 02/26/2021

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS (Motion #1); Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 02/26/2021; Received: 02/26/2021

RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1)

RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1); Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 02/26/2021; Received: 02/26/2021

ORDER - AWARDING FEE (Motion #1)

ORDER - AWARDING FEE (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/02/2021; Received: 03/02/2021

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 03/02/2021; Received: 03/02/2021

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/03/2021; Received: 03/03/2021

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

03/03/2021
View Court Documents

DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/03/2021; Received: 03/03/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/02/2021
View Court Documents

DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 03/02/2021; Received: 03/02/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/02/2021
View Court Documents

DocketORDER - AWARDING FEE (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/02/2021; Received: 03/02/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/26/2021
View Court Documents

DocketRJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1); Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 02/26/2021; Received: 02/26/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/26/2021
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS (Motion #1); Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 02/26/2021; Received: 02/26/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/26/2021
View Court Documents

DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) military search; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 02/26/2021; Received: 02/26/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/26/2021
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) non military; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 02/26/2021; Received: 02/26/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/26/2021
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) 3215; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 02/26/2021; Received: 02/26/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/26/2021
View Court Documents

DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) AOS; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 02/26/2021; Received: 02/26/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/26/2021
View Court Documents

DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) contract; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 02/26/2021; Received: 02/26/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/26/2021
View Court Documents

DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) SC; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 02/26/2021; Received: 02/26/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/26/2021
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES (Motion #1); Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 02/26/2021; Received: 02/26/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/26/2021
View Court Documents

DocketEXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1); Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 02/26/2021; Received: 02/26/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/01/2020
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 09/01/2020; Received: 09/01/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/14/2020
View Court Documents

DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Contract; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 08/14/2020; Received: 08/14/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/14/2020
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 08/14/2020; Received: 08/14/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less