Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Oneida County Courts on 02/20/2020 at 15:25:07 (UTC).

NBT Bank, National Association v. Joseph J. Scialdone III

Case Summary

On 01/04/2019 NBT Bank, National Association filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Joseph J Scialdone III. This case was filed in Oneida County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Bernadette T Clark. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********0022

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Oneida County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Oneida, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Bernadette T Clark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NBT Bank, National Association

Defendant

Joseph J. Scialdone III

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LEVINE, LOUIS

Attorney at MELVIN & MELVIN

GARBUS, MARK A

Attorney at FORSTER & GARBUS LLP

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Garbus, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 01/27/2020; Received: 01/27/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Garbus, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 01/27/2020; Received: 01/27/2020

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/16/2019; Received: 05/16/2019

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 05/09/2019; Received: 05/09/2019

ORDER - AWARDING FEE

ORDER - AWARDING FEE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/08/2019; Received: 05/08/2019

RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #01)

RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #01); Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 04/30/2019; Received: 04/30/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #01) Summons & Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #01) Summons & Complaint; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 04/30/2019; Received: 04/30/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #01) Promissory Note

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #01) Promissory Note; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 04/30/2019; Received: 04/30/2019

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #01) Non-Military Affidavit

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #01) Non-Military Affidavit; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 04/30/2019; Received: 04/30/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #01)

PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #01); Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 04/30/2019; Received: 04/30/2019

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #01) Affidavit of Mailing

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #01) Affidavit of Mailing; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 04/30/2019; Received: 04/30/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS (Motion #01)

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS (Motion #01); Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 04/30/2019; Received: 04/30/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #01)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #01); Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 04/30/2019; Received: 04/30/2019

EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #01)

EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #01); Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 04/30/2019; Received: 04/30/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 03/18/2019; Received: 03/18/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 01/04/2019; Received: 01/04/2019

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Garbus, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 01/27/2020; Received: 01/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Garbus, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 01/27/2020; Received: 01/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/16/2019; Received: 05/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 05/09/2019; Received: 05/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - AWARDING FEE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/08/2019; Received: 05/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #01); Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 04/30/2019; Received: 04/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #01) Summons & Complaint; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 04/30/2019; Received: 04/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #01) Promissory Note; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 04/30/2019; Received: 04/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #01) Non-Military Affidavit; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 04/30/2019; Received: 04/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #01); Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 04/30/2019; Received: 04/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #01) Affidavit of Mailing; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 04/30/2019; Received: 04/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS (Motion #01); Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 04/30/2019; Received: 04/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #01); Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 04/30/2019; Received: 04/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #01); Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 04/30/2019; Received: 04/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 03/18/2019; Received: 03/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 01/04/2019; Received: 01/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less