This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 01:46:05 (UTC).

Navient Credit Finance Corp. - v. - Serge J Adonis et al

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 Navient Credit Finance Corp filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Serge J Adonis. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Navient Credit Finance Corp.

Defendants

Yvette Adonis

Serge J Adonis

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ALTMAN, ANNETTE T

Attorney at FORSTER & GARBUS LLP

LEIDERMAN, JOEL D

Attorney at FORSTER & GARBUS LLP

MEYER, CHRISTOPHER ROBERT

Attorney at Eltman Law P.C.

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE - SERGE J ADONIS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE - SERGE J ADONIS; Filed By: Meyer, C. - filed by Ariasnegron, C.; Filed: 07/05/2017; Received: 07/05/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Meyer, C.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) NOTICE OF DISCONTINUING ACTION

NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) NOTICE OF DISCONTINUING ACTION; Filed By: Altman, A.; Filed: 09/18/2018; Received: 09/18/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE - YVETTE ADONIS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE - YVETTE ADONIS; Filed By: Meyer, C. - filed by Ariasnegron, C.; Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM; Filed By: Meyer, C. - filed by Ariasnegron, C.; Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI) Consent to Change Attorney

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI) Consent to Change Attorney; Filed By: Leiderman, J.; Filed: 05/17/2018; Received: 05/17/2018

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) NOTICE OF DISCONTINUING ACTION; Filed By: Altman, A.; Filed: 09/18/2018; Received: 09/18/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI) Consent to Change Attorney; Filed By: Leiderman, J.; Filed: 05/17/2018; Received: 05/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE - SERGE J ADONIS; Filed By: Meyer, C. - filed by Ariasnegron, C.; Filed: 07/05/2017; Received: 07/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM; Filed By: Meyer, C. - filed by Ariasnegron, C.; Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE - YVETTE ADONIS; Filed By: Meyer, C. - filed by Ariasnegron, C.; Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Meyer, C.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less