This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 02:01:09 (UTC).

Navient Credit Finance Corp. - v. - Camile M Allen

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 Navient Credit Finance Corp filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Camile M Allen. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Navient Credit Finance Corp.

Defendant

Camile M Allen

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEYER, CHRISTOPHER ROBERT

Attorney at Eltman Law P.C.

Defendant Attorney

CHERUBIN, SIDNEY

Attorney at BROOKLYN BAR ASSOCIATION VOLUNTEER LAWYERS PROJECT INC.

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE - CAMILE M ALLEN

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE - CAMILE M ALLEN; Filed By: Meyer, C. - filed by Provest, LLC; Filed: 08/19/2017; Received: 08/19/2017

EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED)

EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED); Filed By: Cherubin, S.; Filed: 09/18/2017; Received: 09/18/2017

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED (Motion #1) MS #1

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED (Motion #1) MS #1; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/20/2017; Received: 11/20/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Meyer, C.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION

RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION; Filed By: Cherubin, S.; Filed: 09/18/2017; Received: 09/18/2017

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION); Filed By: Cherubin, S.; Filed: 09/18/2017; Received: 09/18/2017

ORDER - OTHER Dated:12/14/2017

ORDER - OTHER Dated:12/14/2017; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/18/2017; Received: 12/22/2017

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP; Filed By: Cherubin, S.; Filed: 09/18/2017; Received: 09/18/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM; Filed By: Meyer, C. - filed by Provest, LLC; Filed: 08/19/2017; Received: 08/19/2017

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Cherubin, S.; Filed: 09/18/2017; Received: 09/18/2017

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER Dated:12/14/2017; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/18/2017; Received: 12/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED (Motion #1) MS #1; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/20/2017; Received: 11/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION; Filed By: Cherubin, S.; Filed: 09/18/2017; Received: 09/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Cherubin, S.; Filed: 09/18/2017; Received: 09/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION); Filed By: Cherubin, S.; Filed: 09/18/2017; Received: 09/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP; Filed By: Cherubin, S.; Filed: 09/18/2017; Received: 09/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED); Filed By: Cherubin, S.; Filed: 09/18/2017; Received: 09/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM; Filed By: Meyer, C. - filed by Provest, LLC; Filed: 08/19/2017; Received: 08/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE - CAMILE M ALLEN; Filed By: Meyer, C. - filed by Provest, LLC; Filed: 08/19/2017; Received: 08/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Meyer, C.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less