This case was last updated from Oneida County Courts on 02/08/2020 at 22:33:44 (UTC).

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC - v. - LANCE P. INMAN et al

Case Summary

On 05/09/2017 NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against LANCE P INMAN. This case was filed in Oneida County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********0861

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Oneida County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Oneida, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC

Defendants

MOLLY E. GEBO A/K/A MOLLY E. HENRY

JOHN DOE #1 THROUGH JOHN DOE #12 the last twelve names being fictitious and unknown to plaintiff, the persons or parties intended being the tenants, occupants, persons or corporations, if any, having or claiming an interest in or lien upon the premis

Lance P. Inman

Not Yet Classified

Richard A Cohen Referee

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BORISKIN, SARA Z.

Attorney at RAS BORISKIN, LLC

Not Yet Classified Attorney

COHEN, RICHARD A.

Attorney at Cohen & Cohen

 

Court Documents

REFEREE REPORT OF SALE

REFEREE REPORT OF SALE; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 01/03/2020; Received: 01/03/2020

FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM

FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 12/19/2019; Received: 12/19/2019

FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM

FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM; Filed By: Cohen, R.; Filed: 12/16/2019; Received: 12/16/2019

NOTICE OF SALE

NOTICE OF SALE; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 12/03/2019; Received: 12/03/2019

NOTICE OF SALE

NOTICE OF SALE; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 10/30/2019; Received: 10/30/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 10/11/2019; Received: 10/11/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY

NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 10/11/2019; Received: 10/11/2019

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/03/2019; Received: 10/03/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF DUE DIL.- ATTEMPTS ON JOHN DOE #1 THROUGH JOHN DOE # 12

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF DUE DIL.- ATTEMPTS ON JOHN DOE #1 THROUGH JOHN DOE # 12; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 05/19/2017; Received: 05/19/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS 3215- MAILING MOLLY E. GEBO A/K/A MOLLY E. HENRY

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS 3215- MAILING MOLLY E. GEBO A/K/A MOLLY E. HENRY; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 05/19/2017; Received: 05/19/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS- MOLLY E. GEBO A/K/A MOLLY E. HENRY

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS- MOLLY E. GEBO A/K/A MOLLY E. HENRY; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 05/19/2017; Received: 05/19/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS 3215- MAILING LANCE P. INMAN

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS 3215- MAILING LANCE P. INMAN; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 05/19/2017; Received: 05/19/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS- LANCE P. INMAN

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS- LANCE P. INMAN; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 05/19/2017; Received: 05/19/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 05/09/2017; Received: 05/09/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 05/09/2017; Received: 05/09/2017

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 05/09/2017; Received: 05/09/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 05/09/2017; Received: 05/09/2017

73 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREFEREE REPORT OF SALE; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 01/03/2020; Received: 01/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 12/19/2019; Received: 12/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM; Filed By: Cohen, R.; Filed: 12/16/2019; Received: 12/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SALE; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 12/03/2019; Received: 12/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SALE; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 10/30/2019; Received: 10/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 10/11/2019; Received: 10/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 10/11/2019; Received: 10/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/03/2019; Received: 10/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketJUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE (Motion #03)

    Read MoreRead Less
67 More Docket Entries
  • 05/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOD- 1303 NOTICE OF TENANT OCCUPANTS; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 05/19/2017; Received: 05/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF DUE DIL.- ATTEMPTS ON JOHN DOE #1 THROUGH JOHN DOE # 12; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 05/19/2017; Received: 05/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS 3215- MAILING MOLLY E. GEBO A/K/A MOLLY E. HENRY; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 05/19/2017; Received: 05/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS- MOLLY E. GEBO A/K/A MOLLY E. HENRY; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 05/19/2017; Received: 05/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS 3215- MAILING LANCE P. INMAN; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 05/19/2017; Received: 05/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS- LANCE P. INMAN; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 05/19/2017; Received: 05/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 05/09/2017; Received: 05/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 05/09/2017; Received: 05/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 05/09/2017; Received: 05/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 05/09/2017; Received: 05/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less