Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Albany County Courts on 02/07/2020 at 16:20:35 (UTC).

Nationstar Mortgage LLC - v. - Joseph Barnes et al

Case Summary

On 04/21/2017 Nationstar Mortgage LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Joseph Barnes. This case was filed in Albany County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8-17

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Albany County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Albany, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nationstar Mortgage LLC

Defendants

JOHN DOE, said name being fictitious, it being the intention of Plaintiff to designate any and all occupants of premises being foreclosed herein, and any parties, corporations or entities, if any, having or claiming an interest or lien upon the mortg

Joseph Barnes a/k/a Joseph A. Barnes

Barbara Barnes a/k/a Barbara S. Barnes

Not Yet Classified

The Legal Project

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DI CARO, JOHN A

Attorney at SHAPIRO, DICARO & BARAK, LLP

Defendant and Not Yet Classified Attorneys

LEE, MICHELLE FON ANNE

Attorney at THE LEGAL PROJECT

GULFO, LAURA MARIE

Attorney at City of Albany Corporation Counsel

 

Court Documents

ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE entered by the clerk

ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE entered by the clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/23/2019; Received: 12/23/2019

FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM entered by the clerk

FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM entered by the clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/20/2019; Received: 12/20/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 01/11/2019; Received: 01/11/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #2)

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #2); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 01/11/2019; Received: 01/11/2019

ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY and counterclaims-entered by the clerk

ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY and counterclaims-entered by the clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/09/2019; Received: 01/09/2019

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #2) ORDER CANCELING LIS PENDENS AND DISCONTINUING ACTION AND COUNTERCLAIMS

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #2) ORDER CANCELING LIS PENDENS AND DISCONTINUING ACTION AND COUNTERCLAIMS; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 08/31/2018; Received: 08/31/2018

AFFIRMATION (Motion #2) AFFIRMATION OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE COMPLIANCE

AFFIRMATION (Motion #2) AFFIRMATION OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE COMPLIANCE; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 08/31/2018; Received: 08/31/2018

AFFIRMATION (Motion #2)

AFFIRMATION (Motion #2); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 08/31/2018; Received: 08/31/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BY MAIL

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BY MAIL; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 08/31/2018; Received: 08/31/2018

RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Western District Process Service, LLC; Filed: 05/15/2017; Received: 05/15/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Western District Process Service, LLC; Filed: 05/15/2017; Received: 05/15/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Western District Process Service, LLC; Filed: 05/15/2017; Received: 05/15/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Western District Process Service, LLC; Filed: 05/15/2017; Received: 05/15/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Western District Process Service, LLC; Filed: 05/15/2017; Received: 05/15/2017

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 04/21/2017; Received: 04/21/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 04/21/2017; Received: 04/21/2017

COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 04/21/2017; Received: 04/21/2017

SUMMONS WITH NOTICE

SUMMONS WITH NOTICE; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 04/21/2017; Received: 04/21/2017

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE entered by the clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/23/2019; Received: 12/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM entered by the clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/20/2019; Received: 12/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 01/11/2019; Received: 01/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #2); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 01/11/2019; Received: 01/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY and counterclaims-entered by the clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/09/2019; Received: 01/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #2) ORDER CANCELING LIS PENDENS AND DISCONTINUING ACTION AND COUNTERCLAIMS; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 08/31/2018; Received: 08/31/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #2) AFFIRMATION OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE COMPLIANCE; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 08/31/2018; Received: 08/31/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #2); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 08/31/2018; Received: 08/31/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BY MAIL; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 08/31/2018; Received: 08/31/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2) NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISCONTINUE ACTION AND COUNTERCLAIMS; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 08/31/2018; Received: 08/31/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 05/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F); Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Western District Process Service, LLC; Filed: 05/15/2017; Received: 05/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Western District Process Service, LLC; Filed: 05/15/2017; Received: 05/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Western District Process Service, LLC; Filed: 05/15/2017; Received: 05/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Western District Process Service, LLC; Filed: 05/15/2017; Received: 05/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Western District Process Service, LLC; Filed: 05/15/2017; Received: 05/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Western District Process Service, LLC; Filed: 05/15/2017; Received: 05/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 04/21/2017; Received: 04/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 04/21/2017; Received: 04/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 04/21/2017; Received: 04/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS WITH NOTICE; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 04/21/2017; Received: 04/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less