This case was last updated from Westchester County Courts on 02/16/2020 at 01:46:21 (UTC).

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC - v. - CLIFFORD BRYANT et al

Case Summary

On 06/22/2017 NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against CLIFFORD BRYANT. This case was filed in Westchester County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Westchester County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Westchester, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC

Defendants

DISCOVER BANK

UNIFUND CCR LLC

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA N.A.

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Olga Bryant

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK

Clifford Bryant

John Doe

MSW CAPITAL LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HYMAN, SARAH KRISTIN

NICHOLSON, MARIE THERESA

Attorney at Gross Polowy

POLOWY, AMY E.

Attorney at GROSS POLOWY LLC

GRUBEA, JESSICA JOY

Attorney at Gross Polowy, LLC

VIRGA, CHRISTOPHER

Attorney at Jaspan Schlesinger LLP

 

Court Documents

ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY

ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/15/2017; Received: 09/15/2017

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Nicholson, M.; Filed: 09/07/2017; Received: 09/07/2017

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1); Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 08/23/2017; Received: 08/23/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Notice(S) of Appearance and/or Answered(S) Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Notice(S) of Appearance and/or Answered(S) Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 08/23/2017; Received: 08/23/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons, Complaint, and Notice of Pendency Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons, Complaint, and Notice of Pendency Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 08/23/2017; Received: 08/23/2017

AFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY (Motion #1)

AFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY (Motion #1); Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 08/23/2017; Received: 08/23/2017

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1)

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1); Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 08/23/2017; Received: 08/23/2017

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 08/23/2017; Received: 08/23/2017

FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INTAKE FORM

FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INTAKE FORM; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/18/2017; Received: 08/18/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MIDLAND FUNDING

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MIDLAND FUNDING; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MSW CAPITAL

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MSW CAPITAL; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE UNIFUND CCR LLC AFF BY MAIL

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE UNIFUND CCR LLC AFF BY MAIL; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 07/13/2017; Received: 07/13/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE UNIFUND CCR LLC

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE UNIFUND CCR LLC; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 07/13/2017; Received: 07/13/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE DISCOVER BANK

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE DISCOVER BANK; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 07/12/2017; Received: 07/12/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 07/12/2017; Received: 07/12/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 07/12/2017; Received: 07/12/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/15/2017; Received: 09/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Nicholson, M.; Filed: 09/07/2017; Received: 09/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #1); Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 08/23/2017; Received: 08/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Notice(S) of Appearance and/or Answered(S) Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 08/23/2017; Received: 08/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons, Complaint, and Notice of Pendency Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 08/23/2017; Received: 08/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY (Motion #1); Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 08/23/2017; Received: 08/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1); Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 08/23/2017; Received: 08/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 08/23/2017; Received: 08/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INTAKE FORM; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/18/2017; Received: 08/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/25/2017; Received: 07/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CLIFFORD BRYANT AOS; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MIDLAND FUNDING; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MSW CAPITAL; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE UNIFUND CCR LLC AFF BY MAIL; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 07/13/2017; Received: 07/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE UNIFUND CCR LLC; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 07/13/2017; Received: 07/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE DISCOVER BANK; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 07/12/2017; Received: 07/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 07/12/2017; Received: 07/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 07/12/2017; Received: 07/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less