This case was last updated from Oneida County Courts on 02/08/2020 at 19:57:07 (UTC).

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC - v. - ANTONIO SULTAN et al

Case Summary

On 05/05/2017 NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ANTONIO SULTAN. This case was filed in Oneida County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********0836

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Oneida County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Oneida, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC

Defendants

Nancy Sultan

Antonio Sultan

John Doe

Not Yet Classified

Law Offices of Julie Giruzzi Mosca, PLLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HYMAN, SARAH KRISTIN

POLOWY, AMY E.

Attorney at GROSS POLOWY LLC

JUREK, AMBER AUGUSTINE

Attorney at Gross Polowy, LLC

WILLIAMS, COURTNEY R.

Attorney at Gross Polowy, LLC

GRUBEA, JESSICA JOY

Attorney at Gross Polowy, LLC

Not Yet Classified Attorney

GIRUZZI-MOSCA, JULIE

Attorney at Law Offices of Julie Giruzzi Mosca, PLLC

 

Court Documents

FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM

FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM; Filed By: Giruzzi-Mosca, J.; Filed: 10/24/2018; Received: 10/24/2018

REPORT OF SALE (SURPLUS MONIES) -APPOINTED REFEREE

REPORT OF SALE (SURPLUS MONIES) -APPOINTED REFEREE; Filed By: Jurek, A.; Filed: 06/08/2018; Received: 06/08/2018

REFEREE REPORT OF SALE

REFEREE REPORT OF SALE; Filed By: Jurek, A.; Filed: 06/06/2018; Received: 06/06/2018

JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE

JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/23/2018; Received: 05/23/2018

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #02)

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #02); Filed By: Jurek, A.; Filed: 03/28/2018; Received: 03/28/2018

JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE

JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/14/2018; Received: 03/14/2018

JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE

JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/09/2018; Received: 03/09/2018

BILL OF COSTS (Motion #02)

BILL OF COSTS (Motion #02); Filed By: Williams, C.; Filed: 02/26/2018; Received: 02/26/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - A-N (Motion #02) Exhibits A-N

EXHIBIT(S) - A-N (Motion #02) Exhibits A-N; Filed By: Williams, C.; Filed: 02/26/2018; Received: 02/26/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OCCUPANT 1303

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OCCUPANT 1303; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 05/30/2017; Received: 05/30/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ANETTE MCBRIDE S/H/A JOHN DOE 1 1303

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ANETTE MCBRIDE S/H/A JOHN DOE 1 1303; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 05/30/2017; Received: 05/30/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ANETTE MCBRIDE S/H/A JOHN DOE 1

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ANETTE MCBRIDE S/H/A JOHN DOE 1; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 05/30/2017; Received: 05/30/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 05/30/2017; Received: 05/30/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ANTONIO SULTAN 3215

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ANTONIO SULTAN 3215; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 05/30/2017; Received: 05/30/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ANTONIO SULTAN

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ANTONIO SULTAN; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 05/30/2017; Received: 05/30/2017

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 05/05/2017; Received: 05/05/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 05/05/2017; Received: 05/05/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 05/05/2017; Received: 05/05/2017

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM; Filed By: Giruzzi-Mosca, J.; Filed: 10/24/2018; Received: 10/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPORT OF SALE (SURPLUS MONIES) -APPOINTED REFEREE; Filed By: Jurek, A.; Filed: 06/08/2018; Received: 06/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREFEREE REPORT OF SALE; Filed By: Jurek, A.; Filed: 06/06/2018; Received: 06/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/23/2018; Received: 05/23/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #02); Filed By: Jurek, A.; Filed: 03/28/2018; Received: 03/28/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/14/2018; Received: 03/14/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/09/2018; Received: 03/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBILL OF COSTS (Motion #02); Filed By: Williams, C.; Filed: 02/26/2018; Received: 02/26/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A-N (Motion #02) Exhibits A-N; Filed By: Williams, C.; Filed: 02/26/2018; Received: 02/26/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY (Motion #02); Filed By: Williams, C.; Filed: 02/26/2018; Received: 02/26/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 06/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NANCY SULTAN AOS; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 06/02/2017; Received: 06/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OCCUPANT 1303; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 05/30/2017; Received: 05/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ANETTE MCBRIDE S/H/A JOHN DOE 1 1303; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 05/30/2017; Received: 05/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ANETTE MCBRIDE S/H/A JOHN DOE 1; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 05/30/2017; Received: 05/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 05/30/2017; Received: 05/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ANTONIO SULTAN 3215; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 05/30/2017; Received: 05/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ANTONIO SULTAN; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 05/30/2017; Received: 05/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 05/05/2017; Received: 05/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 05/05/2017; Received: 05/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 05/05/2017; Received: 05/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less