Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Albany County Courts on 06/26/2020 at 00:30:05 (UTC).

Nationstar Mortgage LLC d/b/a Mr. Cooper v. Sindi M. Saita et al

Case Summary

On 02/03/2020 Nationstar Mortgage LLC d/b/a Mr Cooper filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Sindi M Saita. This case was filed in Albany County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4-20

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Albany County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Albany, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nationstar Mortgage LLC d/b/a Mr. Cooper

Defendants

1801 Western Avenue, LLC

House of Wu

JOHN DOE #1 THROUGH JOHN DOE #10, THE LAST TEN NAMES BEING FICTITIOUS AND UNKNOWN TO THE PLAINTIFF, having or claiming an interest in or lien upon the Mortgaged premises described in the Complaint

Board of Directors of the Weatherfield Park Phase I Homeowners' Association

HAVING OR CLAIMING AN INTEREST IN OR LIEN UPON THE MORTGAGED PREMISES DESCRIBED IN THE COMPLAINT

Sindi M. Saita

United States of America - Internal Revenue Service

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FALASCO, TODD C

Attorney at FRENKEL, LAMBERT, WEISS, WEISMAN & GORDON

Defendant Attorney

SPINA, THOMAS

Attorney at U S ATTORNEY'S OFFICE NDNY

 

Court Documents

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F); Filed By: Falasco, T.; Filed: 03/16/2020; Received: 03/16/2020

RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed By: Falasco, T.; Filed: 03/16/2020; Received: 03/16/2020

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Falasco, T.; Filed: 03/16/2020; Received: 03/16/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Falasco, T.; Filed: 03/16/2020; Received: 03/16/2020

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ANSWER TO COMPLAINT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/02/2020; Received: 03/03/2020

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Provest; Filed: 02/26/2020; Received: 02/26/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-UNITED STATES OF AMERICA - INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-UNITED STATES OF AMERICA - INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Provest; Filed: 02/26/2020; Received: 02/26/2020

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Spina, T.; Filed: 02/20/2020; Received: 02/20/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SINDI M. SAITA

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SINDI M. SAITA; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 02/19/2020; Received: 02/19/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING - ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING - ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 02/19/2020; Received: 02/19/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE HOUSE OF WU

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE HOUSE OF WU; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 02/19/2020; Received: 02/19/2020

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 02/18/2020; Received: 02/18/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 1801 WESTERN AVENUE, LLC

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 1801 WESTERN AVENUE, LLC; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 02/18/2020; Received: 02/18/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE WEATHERFIELD PARK PHASE I HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION INC S/H/A BOARD OF DIRECTORS ... show more

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE WEATHERFIELD PARK PHASE I HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION INC S/H/A BOARD OF DIRECTORS ... show more; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 02/18/2020; Received: 02/18/2020

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Falasco, T.; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 02/03/2020

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Certificate of Merit Attached Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Certificate of Merit Attached Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Falasco, T.; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 02/03/2020

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F); Filed By: Falasco, T.; Filed: 03/16/2020; Received: 03/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed By: Falasco, T.; Filed: 03/16/2020; Received: 03/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Falasco, T.; Filed: 03/16/2020; Received: 03/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Falasco, T.; Filed: 03/16/2020; Received: 03/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ANSWER TO COMPLAINT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/02/2020; Received: 03/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Provest; Filed: 02/26/2020; Received: 02/26/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-UNITED STATES OF AMERICA - INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Provest; Filed: 02/26/2020; Received: 02/26/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Spina, T.; Filed: 02/20/2020; Received: 02/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SINDI M. SAITA; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 02/19/2020; Received: 02/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING - ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 02/19/2020; Received: 02/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE HOUSE OF WU; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 02/19/2020; Received: 02/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 02/18/2020; Received: 02/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 1801 WESTERN AVENUE, LLC; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 02/18/2020; Received: 02/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE WEATHERFIELD PARK PHASE I HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION INC S/H/A BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE WEATHERFIELD PARK PHASE I HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 02/18/2020; Received: 02/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Falasco, T.; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 02/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Certificate of Merit Attached Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Falasco, T.; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 02/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less