This case was last updated from Putnam County New York Courts on 05/01/2020 at 20:57:21 (UTC).

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC D/B/A MR. COOPER - v. - KELLY KUBENIK et al

Case Summary

On 06/04/2018 NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC D/B/A MR COOPER filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against KELLY KUBENIK. This case was filed in Putnam County New York Courts, Supreme Court located in Niagara, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2018

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Putnam, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC D/B/A MR. COOPER

Defendants

Kelly Kubenik

JOHN DOE #1 through JOHN DOE #12 the last twelve names being fictitious and unknown to plaintiff, the persons or parties intended being the tenants, occupants, persons or corporations, if any, having or claiming an interest in or lien upon the premis

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BORISKIN, SARA Z.

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION Affirmation in Support of Cancellation of Notice of Pendency

AFFIRMATION Affirmation in Support of Cancellation of Notice of Pendency; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 01/08/2019; Received: 01/08/2019

AFFIRMATION Affirmation in Support of Discontinuance of Action

AFFIRMATION Affirmation in Support of Discontinuance of Action; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 01/08/2019; Received: 01/08/2019

CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS

CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 01/08/2019; Received: 01/08/2019

NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 01/08/2019; Received: 01/08/2019

FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INTAKE FORM

FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INTAKE FORM; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/08/2018; Received: 08/08/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - A Mailing List

EXHIBIT(S) - A Mailing List; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 07/09/2018; Received: 07/09/2018

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F); Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 07/09/2018; Received: 07/09/2018

RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE RJI

RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE RJI; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 07/09/2018; Received: 07/09/2018

AFFIDAVIT AOD

AFFIDAVIT AOD; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 07/09/2018; Received: 07/09/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS MICHAEL KUBENIK AS "JOHN DOE #1"

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS MICHAEL KUBENIK AS "JOHN DOE #1"; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/14/2018; Received: 06/14/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS 3215 KELLY KUBENIK

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS 3215 KELLY KUBENIK; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/14/2018; Received: 06/14/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS KELLY KUBENIK

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS KELLY KUBENIK; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/14/2018; Received: 06/14/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - B EXHIBIT B NOTE FOR CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - B EXHIBIT B NOTE FOR CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/05/2018; Received: 06/05/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/04/2018; Received: 06/04/2018

NOTICE OF PENDENCY NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/04/2018; Received: 06/04/2018

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT *Corrected* CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT *Corrected* CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/04/2018; Received: 06/05/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - A EXHIBIT A - NOTE FOR SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - A EXHIBIT A - NOTE FOR SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/04/2018; Received: 06/04/2018

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/04/2018; Received: 06/04/2018

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

01/08/2019
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIRMATION Affirmation in Support of Cancellation of Notice of Pendency; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 01/08/2019; Received: 01/08/2019

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/08/2019
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIRMATION Affirmation in Support of Discontinuance of Action; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 01/08/2019; Received: 01/08/2019

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/08/2019
View Court Documents

DocketCANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 01/08/2019; Received: 01/08/2019

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/08/2019
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 01/08/2019; Received: 01/08/2019

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2018
View Court Documents

DocketFORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INTAKE FORM; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/08/2018; Received: 08/08/2018

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/09/2018
View Court Documents

DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Mailing List; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 07/09/2018; Received: 07/09/2018

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/09/2018
View Court Documents

DocketADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F); Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 07/09/2018; Received: 07/09/2018

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/09/2018
View Court Documents

DocketRJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE RJI; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 07/09/2018; Received: 07/09/2018

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/09/2018
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT AOD; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 07/09/2018; Received: 07/09/2018

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/09/2018
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT AOD JD1; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 07/09/2018; Received: 07/09/2018

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
06/14/2018
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOD MICHAEL KUBENIK AS "JOHN DOE #1"; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/14/2018; Received: 06/14/2018

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2018
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS MICHAEL KUBENIK AS "JOHN DOE #1"; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/14/2018; Received: 06/14/2018

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2018
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS 3215 KELLY KUBENIK; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/14/2018; Received: 06/14/2018

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2018
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS KELLY KUBENIK; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/14/2018; Received: 06/14/2018

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/05/2018
View Court Documents

DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B EXHIBIT B NOTE FOR CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/05/2018; Received: 06/05/2018

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/04/2018
View Court Documents

DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/04/2018; Received: 06/04/2018

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/04/2018
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/04/2018; Received: 06/04/2018

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/04/2018
View Court Documents

DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT *Corrected* CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/04/2018; Received: 06/05/2018

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/04/2018
View Court Documents

DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A EXHIBIT A - NOTE FOR SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/04/2018; Received: 06/04/2018

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/04/2018
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/04/2018; Received: 06/04/2018

[+] Read More [-] Read Less