This case was last updated from Dutchess County Courts on 06/28/2020 at 04:57:04 (UTC).

Nationstar Mortgage LLC d/b/a Mr. Cooper - v. - Jessica Serrano et al

Case Summary

On 11/02/2017 Nationstar Mortgage LLC d/b/a Mr Cooper filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Jessica Serrano. This case was filed in Dutchess County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is James D Pagones. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2815

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Dutchess, New York

Judge Details

Judge

James D Pagones

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nationstar Mortgage LLC d/b/a Mr. Cooper

Defendants

JOHN DOE, said name being fictitious, it being the intention of Plaintiff to designate any and all occupants of premises being foreclosed herein, and any parties, corporations or entities, if any, having or claiming an interest or lien upon the mortg

Edwin Gonzalez

The Board of Managers of the Envoy Plaza Condominium Homeowners Association

Jessica Serrano a/k/a Jessica S. Serrano a/k/a Jessica S. Gonzalez

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DI CARO, JOHN A

Attorney at SHAPIRO, DICARO & BARAK, LLP

POTENZA, BETTY JEAN

Defendant Attorney

SULLIVAN, PAUL O.

Attorney at CORBALLY, GARTLAND AND RAPPLEYEA, LLP

 

Court Documents

FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM

FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 09/12/2018; Received: 09/12/2018

REFEREE REPORT OF SALE

REFEREE REPORT OF SALE; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 09/12/2018; Received: 09/12/2018

FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM

FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM; Filed By: Potenza, B.; Filed: 08/09/2018; Received: 08/09/2018

BILL OF COSTS As entered by the County Clerk

BILL OF COSTS As entered by the County Clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/04/2018; Received: 06/04/2018

JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE As entered by County Clerk

JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE As entered by County Clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/04/2018; Received: 06/04/2018

NOTICE OF ENTRY

NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 05/29/2018; Received: 05/29/2018

JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE

JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/24/2018; Received: 05/24/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #002) Additional Notice of Pendency

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #002) Additional Notice of Pendency; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 04/04/2018; Received: 04/04/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #002) Certificate of Merit

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #002) Certificate of Merit; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 04/04/2018; Received: 04/04/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - EDWIN GONZALEZ

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - EDWIN GONZALEZ; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 12/27/2017; Received: 12/27/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - JESSICA SERRANO A/K/A JESSICA S. GONZALEZ A/K/A JESSICA GONZALEZ A/K/A JESSIC ... show more

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - JESSICA SERRANO A/K/A JESSICA S. GONZALEZ A/K/A JESSICA GONZALEZ A/K/A JESSIC ... show more; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 12/27/2017; Received: 12/27/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-THE BOARD OF MANAGERS OF THE ENVOY PLAZA CONDOMINIUM HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-THE BOARD OF MANAGERS OF THE ENVOY PLAZA CONDOMINIUM HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Provest; Filed: 12/07/2017; Received: 12/07/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Provest; Filed: 11/29/2017; Received: 11/29/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING-ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING-ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Provest; Filed: 11/29/2017; Received: 11/29/2017

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 11/02/2017; Received: 11/02/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 11/02/2017; Received: 11/02/2017

COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 11/02/2017; Received: 11/02/2017

SUMMONS WITH NOTICE

SUMMONS WITH NOTICE; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 11/02/2017; Received: 11/02/2017

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 09/12/2018; Received: 09/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREFEREE REPORT OF SALE; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 09/12/2018; Received: 09/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM; Filed By: Potenza, B.; Filed: 08/09/2018; Received: 08/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBILL OF COSTS As entered by the County Clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/04/2018; Received: 06/04/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE As entered by County Clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/04/2018; Received: 06/04/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 05/29/2018; Received: 05/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/24/2018; Received: 05/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #002) Additional Notice of Pendency; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 04/04/2018; Received: 04/04/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #002) Certificate of Merit; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 04/04/2018; Received: 04/04/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #002) Military Status Affidavit Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 04/04/2018; Received: 04/04/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 12/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 12/27/2017; Received: 12/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - EDWIN GONZALEZ; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 12/27/2017; Received: 12/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - JESSICA SERRANO A/K/A JESSICA S. GONZALEZ A/K/A JESSICA GONZALEZ A/K/A JESSICA S. SERRANO; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 12/27/2017; Received: 12/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-THE BOARD OF MANAGERS OF THE ENVOY PLAZA CONDOMINIUM HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Provest; Filed: 12/07/2017; Received: 12/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Provest; Filed: 11/29/2017; Received: 11/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING-ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Provest; Filed: 11/29/2017; Received: 11/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 11/02/2017; Received: 11/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 11/02/2017; Received: 11/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 11/02/2017; Received: 11/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS WITH NOTICE; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 11/02/2017; Received: 11/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less