This case was last updated from Broome County Courts on 05/12/2020 at 19:35:39 (UTC).

Nationstar Mortgage LLC d/b/a Mr. Cooper - v. - Gerald Lauko et al

Case Summary

On 09/25/2018 Nationstar Mortgage LLC d/b/a Mr Cooper filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Gerald Lauko. This case was filed in Broome County Courts, Supreme Court located in Orange, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Rita Connerton. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2516

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Broome, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Rita Connerton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nationstar Mortgage LLC d/b/a Mr. Cooper

Defendants

Lauko gerald M A/k/a

JOHN DOE, SAID NAME BEING FICTITIOUS, IT BEING THE INTENTION OF PLAINTIFF TO DES

CORPORATIONS OR ENTITIES, IF ANY, HAVING OR CLAIMING AN INTEREST OR LIEN UPON TH

Gerald Lauko a/k/a Gerald M. Lauko

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DI CARO, JOHN A

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS WITH NOTICE

SUMMONS WITH NOTICE; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 09/25/2018; Received: 09/25/2018

COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 09/25/2018; Received: 09/25/2018

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 09/25/2018; Received: 09/25/2018

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 09/25/2018; Received: 09/25/2018

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion to Discontinue Action

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion to Discontinue Action; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 01/17/2019; Received: 01/17/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service by Mail

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service by Mail; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 01/17/2019; Received: 01/17/2019

AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) Affirmation

AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) Affirmation; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 01/17/2019; Received: 01/17/2019

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1) Order Canceling Lis Pendens and Discontinuing Action

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1) Order Canceling Lis Pendens and Discontinuing Action; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 01/17/2019; Received: 01/17/2019

RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (Motion #1)

RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (Motion #1); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 01/17/2019; Received: 01/17/2019

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) (Motion #1)

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) (Motion #1); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 01/17/2019; Received: 01/17/2019

ASSIGNED RJI

ASSIGNED RJI; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/18/2019; Received: 01/18/2019

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1) Adjournment letter

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1) Adjournment letter; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 01/29/2019; Received: 01/29/2019

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Affidavit of Mailing

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Affidavit of Mailing; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 01/29/2019; Received: 01/29/2019

ORDER - CANCELLING AND DISCHARGING SATISFACTION OF MORTGAGE (Motion #1)

ORDER - CANCELLING AND DISCHARGING SATISFACTION OF MORTGAGE (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 03/01/2019; Received: 03/01/2019

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 03/01/2019; Received: 03/01/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - CANCELLING AND DISCHARGING SATISFACTION OF MORTGAGE (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Affidavit of Mailing; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 01/29/2019; Received: 01/29/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1) Adjournment letter; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 01/29/2019; Received: 01/29/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketASSIGNED RJI; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/18/2019; Received: 01/18/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) (Motion #1); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 01/17/2019; Received: 01/17/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (Motion #1); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 01/17/2019; Received: 01/17/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1) Order Canceling Lis Pendens and Discontinuing Action; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 01/17/2019; Received: 01/17/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #1) Affirmation; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 01/17/2019; Received: 01/17/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service by Mail; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 01/17/2019; Received: 01/17/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion to Discontinue Action; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 01/17/2019; Received: 01/17/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 09/25/2018; Received: 09/25/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 09/25/2018; Received: 09/25/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 09/25/2018; Received: 09/25/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS WITH NOTICE; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 09/25/2018; Received: 09/25/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DI CARO, JOHN A