This case was last updated from Dutchess County Courts on 04/16/2020 at 04:13:21 (UTC).

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC D/B/A MR. COOPER - v. - CHRISTI COHEN et al

Case Summary

On 11/02/2017 NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC D/B/A MR COOPER filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against CHRISTI COHEN. This case was filed in Dutchess County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2817

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Dutchess, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC D/B/A MR. COOPER

Defendants

Jason Cohen

Carl S. Chu

John Doe

Christi Cohen

MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC. AS NOMINEE FOR GMAC MORTGAGE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

STRAUSS, LAURA MARIE

Attorney at Gross Polowy Orlans LLC

GAZZO, NICOLE CAROL

Attorney at GROSS POLOWY, LLC

POLOWY, AMY E.

Attorney at GROSS POLOWY LLC

GRUBEA, JESSICA JOY

Attorney at Gross Polowy, LLC

HYMAN, SARAH KRISTIN

Attorney at Calamar

Defendant Attorney

ROTH, GERALD C

Attorney at STEIN WIENER & ROTH L.L.P.

 

Court Documents

ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY

ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/13/2018; Received: 04/12/2018

FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM

FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/27/2018; Received: 03/27/2018

FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM

FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/27/2018; Received: 03/27/2018

FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INTAKE FORM

FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INTAKE FORM; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/27/2018; Received: 03/27/2018

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 03/20/2018; Received: 03/20/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - B A copy of any Notice(s) of Appearance and/or Answer(s) Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - B A copy of any Notice(s) of Appearance and/or Answer(s) Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 03/20/2018; Received: 03/20/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - A Copies of the Summons, Complaint, and Notice of Pendency Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - A Copies of the Summons, Complaint, and Notice of Pendency Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 03/20/2018; Received: 03/20/2018

AFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY

AFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY; Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 03/20/2018; Received: 03/20/2018

ORDER ( PROPOSED )

ORDER ( PROPOSED ); Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 03/20/2018; Received: 03/20/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC.

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC.; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 11/17/2017; Received: 11/17/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 11/17/2017; Received: 11/17/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 11/17/2017; Received: 11/17/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 11/17/2017; Received: 11/17/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 11/16/2017; Received: 11/16/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 11/16/2017; Received: 11/16/2017

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 11/02/2017; Received: 11/02/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 11/02/2017; Received: 11/02/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 11/02/2017; Received: 11/02/2017

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/13/2018; Received: 04/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/27/2018; Received: 03/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/27/2018; Received: 03/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INTAKE FORM; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/27/2018; Received: 03/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 03/20/2018; Received: 03/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B A copy of any Notice(s) of Appearance and/or Answer(s) Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 03/20/2018; Received: 03/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Copies of the Summons, Complaint, and Notice of Pendency Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 03/20/2018; Received: 03/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY; Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 03/20/2018; Received: 03/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ); Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 03/20/2018; Received: 03/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION; Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 03/20/2018; Received: 03/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 11/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 11/17/2017; Received: 11/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC.; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 11/17/2017; Received: 11/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 11/17/2017; Received: 11/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 11/17/2017; Received: 11/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 11/17/2017; Received: 11/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 11/16/2017; Received: 11/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 11/16/2017; Received: 11/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 11/02/2017; Received: 11/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 11/02/2017; Received: 11/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 11/02/2017; Received: 11/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less