This case was last updated from Richmond County Courts on 02/25/2020 at 19:41:44 (UTC).

Nationstar Mortgage LLC d/b/a Mr. Cooper v. Anthony Marini et al

Case Summary

On 04/01/2019 Nationstar Mortgage LLC d/b/a Mr Cooper filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Anthony Marini. This case was filed in Richmond County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Richmond County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Richmond, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nationstar Mortgage LLC d/b/a Mr. Cooper

Defendants

Alan Britman a/k/a Alan J. Britman

City of New York Parking Violations Bureau

JOHN DOE, said name being fictitious, it being the intention of Plaintiff to designate any and all occupants of premises being foreclosed herein, and any parties, corporations or entities, if any, having or claiming an interest or lien upon the mortg

City of New York Environmental Control Board

Wendy Marini

Anthony Marini

The United States of America acting through The Secretary of Housing and Urban Development

City of New York Transit Adjudication Bureau

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DI CARO, JOHN A

Attorney at SHAPIRO, DICARO & BARAK, LLP

Defendant Attorneys

PERSON, CARL E.

SCHWARTZ, BETH PATRICIA

Attorney at U S ATTORNEY EASTERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #001)

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Person, C.; Filed: 01/27/2020; Received: 01/27/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #001) Affidavit of Military

EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #001) Affidavit of Military; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #001) Entity Information Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #001) Entity Information Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) 90 Day Notice and proof of filing Possible SSN Administratively Redacted Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) 90 Day Notice and proof of filing Possible SSN Administratively Redacted Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Notice of Default Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Notice of Default Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Assignments of Mortgage Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Assignments of Mortgage Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Mortgage Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Mortgage Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Note Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Note Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #001) Affidavit of Mailing

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #001) Affidavit of Mailing; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CITY OF NY TRANSIT

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CITY OF NY TRANSIT; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 04/11/2019; Received: 04/11/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CITY OF NY PARKING

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CITY OF NY PARKING; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 04/11/2019; Received: 04/11/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CITY OF NY ENVIRONMENTAL

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CITY OF NY ENVIRONMENTAL; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 04/11/2019; Received: 04/11/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 04/11/2019; Received: 04/11/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING THROUGH THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING & URBAN DEVLPT

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING THROUGH THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING & URBAN DEVLPT; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 04/11/2019; Received: 04/11/2019

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 04/01/2019; Received: 04/01/2019

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 04/01/2019; Received: 04/01/2019

COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 04/01/2019; Received: 04/01/2019

SUMMONS WITH NOTICE

SUMMONS WITH NOTICE; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 04/01/2019; Received: 04/01/2019

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Person, C.; Filed: 01/27/2020; Received: 01/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #001) Affidavit of Military; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #001) Entity Information Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) 90 Day Notice and proof of filing Possible SSN Administratively Redacted Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Notice of Default Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Assignments of Mortgage Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Mortgage Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Note Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #001) Affidavit of Mailing; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #001); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 04/11/2019; Received: 04/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CITY OF NY TRANSIT; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 04/11/2019; Received: 04/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CITY OF NY PARKING; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 04/11/2019; Received: 04/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CITY OF NY ENVIRONMENTAL; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 04/11/2019; Received: 04/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 04/11/2019; Received: 04/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING THROUGH THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING & URBAN DEVLPT; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 04/11/2019; Received: 04/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 04/01/2019; Received: 04/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 04/01/2019; Received: 04/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 04/01/2019; Received: 04/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS WITH NOTICE; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 04/01/2019; Received: 04/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less