This case was last updated from Westchester County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 15:20:10 (UTC).

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC D/B/A MR COOPER - v. - ANNA KUSNIROVA et al

Case Summary

On 06/12/2017 NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC D/B/A MR COOPER filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against ANNA KUSNIROVA. This case was filed in Westchester County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Westchester County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Westchester, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC D/B/A MR COOPER

Defendants

UNITIED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING ON BEHALF OF THE IRS

UNKNOWN HEIRS AND/OR DISTRIBUTEES TO THE ESTATE OF MICHAL KUSNIR

Anna Kusnirova

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

POLOWY, AMY E.

Attorney at GROSS POLOWY LLC

CASTER, AUSTIN ROBERT

Attorney at Gross Polowy, LLC

Defendant Attorney

ZEBROWSKI, KATHLEEN A

Attorney at U S DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U S ATTORNEYS OFFICE

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit pursuant to RPAPL 1352

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit pursuant to RPAPL 1352; Filed By: Caster, A.; Filed: 05/01/2018; Received: 05/01/2018

NOTICE OF ENTRY

NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Caster, A.; Filed: 04/20/2018; Received: 04/20/2018

JUDGMENT - DECLARATORY

JUDGMENT - DECLARATORY; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/17/2018; Received: 04/17/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2); Filed By: Caster, A.; Filed: 01/11/2018; Received: 01/11/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #2) Ex E_Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #2) Ex E_Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale; Filed By: Caster, A.; Filed: 01/11/2018; Received: 01/11/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #2) Ex D_Supplemental Summons and Amended Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #2) Ex D_Supplemental Summons and Amended Complaint; Filed By: Caster, A.; Filed: 01/11/2018; Received: 01/11/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) Ex C_Notice of Appearance and Affidavits of Service

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) Ex C_Notice of Appearance and Affidavits of Service; Filed By: Caster, A.; Filed: 01/11/2018; Received: 01/11/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Ex B_Order and Publication Affidavits

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Ex B_Order and Publication Affidavits; Filed By: Caster, A.; Filed: 01/11/2018; Received: 01/11/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Ex A_Summons and Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Ex A_Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Caster, A.; Filed: 01/11/2018; Received: 01/11/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Summons and Complaint Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Summons and Complaint Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Caster, A.; Filed: 09/05/2017; Received: 09/05/2017

AFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY (Motion #001)

AFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY (Motion #001); Filed By: Caster, A.; Filed: 09/05/2017; Received: 09/05/2017

EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #001)

EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #001); Filed By: Caster, A.; Filed: 09/05/2017; Received: 09/05/2017

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Zebrowski, K.; Filed: 09/05/2017; Received: 09/05/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING ON BEHALF OF THE IRS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING ON BEHALF OF THE IRS; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 07/25/2017; Received: 07/25/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING ON BEHALF OF THE IRS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING ON BEHALF OF THE IRS; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Caster, A.; Filed: 06/12/2017; Received: 06/12/2017

SUMMONS Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Caster, A.; Filed: 06/12/2017; Received: 06/12/2017

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit pursuant to RPAPL 1352; Filed By: Caster, A.; Filed: 05/01/2018; Received: 05/01/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Caster, A.; Filed: 04/20/2018; Received: 04/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - DECLARATORY; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/17/2018; Received: 04/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2); Filed By: Caster, A.; Filed: 01/11/2018; Received: 01/11/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #2) Ex E_Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale; Filed By: Caster, A.; Filed: 01/11/2018; Received: 01/11/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #2) Ex D_Supplemental Summons and Amended Complaint; Filed By: Caster, A.; Filed: 01/11/2018; Received: 01/11/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) Ex C_Notice of Appearance and Affidavits of Service; Filed By: Caster, A.; Filed: 01/11/2018; Received: 01/11/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Ex B_Order and Publication Affidavits; Filed By: Caster, A.; Filed: 01/11/2018; Received: 01/11/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Ex A_Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Caster, A.; Filed: 01/11/2018; Received: 01/11/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #2); Filed By: Caster, A.; Filed: 01/11/2018; Received: 01/11/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Affidavit Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Caster, A.; Filed: 09/05/2017; Received: 09/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Summons and Complaint Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Caster, A.; Filed: 09/05/2017; Received: 09/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY (Motion #001); Filed By: Caster, A.; Filed: 09/05/2017; Received: 09/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #001); Filed By: Caster, A.; Filed: 09/05/2017; Received: 09/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Zebrowski, K.; Filed: 09/05/2017; Received: 09/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING ON BEHALF OF THE IRS; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 07/25/2017; Received: 07/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING ON BEHALF OF THE IRS; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Caster, A.; Filed: 06/12/2017; Received: 06/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Caster, A.; Filed: 06/12/2017; Received: 06/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less