Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Albany County Courts on 06/26/2020 at 04:17:53 (UTC).

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC D/B/A CHAMPION MORTGAGE COMPANY v. SCOTT J. ROCKWELL et al

Case Summary

On 02/12/2020 NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC D/B/A CHAMPION MORTGAGE COMPANY filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against SCOTT J ROCKWELL. This case was filed in Albany County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6-20

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Albany County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Albany, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC D/B/A CHAMPION MORTGAGE COMPANY

Defendants

Scott J. Rockwell AS EXECUTOR OF THE ESTATE OF VIOLA ROCKWELL

AS EXECUTOR OF THE ESTATE OF VIOLA ROCKWELL

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING THROUGH THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT

John Doe

TRUSTCO BANK SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO TRUSTCO BANK, N.A. SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO HOME & CITY SAVINGS BA

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK

ALBANY COUNTY CLERK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HYMAN, SARAH KRISTIN

Attorney at Calamar

GAZZO, NICOLE CAROL

Attorney at GROSS POLOWY, LLC

ROSENFELD, STEVEN

Attorney at Gross Polowy LLC

FAY, RICHARD PATRICK

Attorney at Gross Polowy LLC

Defendant Attorney

SPINA, THOMAS

Attorney at U S ATTORNEY'S OFFICE NDNY

 

Court Documents

CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS

CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS; Filed By: Fay, R.; Filed: 06/03/2020; Received: 06/03/2020

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Fay, R.; Filed: 06/03/2020; Received: 06/03/2020

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F); Filed By: Rosenfeld, S.; Filed: 03/05/2020; Received: 03/05/2020

RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed By: Rosenfeld, S.; Filed: 03/05/2020; Received: 03/05/2020

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Spina, T.; Filed: 02/26/2020; Received: 02/26/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE TRUSTCO BANK CORP N Y S/H/A TRUSTCO BANK SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO TRUSTCO BANK, N.A. SUCCESSOR BY MERG ... show more

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE TRUSTCO BANK CORP N Y S/H/A TRUSTCO BANK SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO TRUSTCO BANK, N.A. SUCCESSOR BY MERG ... show more; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 02/24/2020; Received: 02/24/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING THROUGH THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING THROUGH THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 02/24/2020; Received: 02/24/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ROBERT "BOBBY" ROCKWELL PERSONAL SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ROBERT "BOBBY" ROCKWELL PERSONAL SERVICE; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 02/24/2020; Received: 02/24/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SCOTT J ROCKWELL PERSONAL SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SCOTT J ROCKWELL PERSONAL SERVICE; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 02/24/2020; Received: 02/24/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ROBERT "BOBBY" ROCKWELL 3215 MAILING

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ROBERT "BOBBY" ROCKWELL 3215 MAILING; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 02/21/2020; Received: 02/21/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ROBERT "BOBBY" ROCKWELL 1303 MAILING

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ROBERT "BOBBY" ROCKWELL 1303 MAILING; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 02/21/2020; Received: 02/21/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING THROUGH THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT CERTIFIED MAI ... show more

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING THROUGH THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT CERTIFIED MAI ... show more; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 02/21/2020; Received: 02/21/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SCOTT J ROCKWELL 3215 MAILING

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SCOTT J ROCKWELL 3215 MAILING; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 02/21/2020; Received: 02/21/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ALBANY COUNTY CLERK

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ALBANY COUNTY CLERK; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 02/20/2020; Received: 02/20/2020

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 02/17/2020; Received: 02/17/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 02/17/2020; Received: 02/17/2020

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 02/12/2020; Received: 02/12/2020

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 02/12/2020; Received: 02/12/2020

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS; Filed By: Fay, R.; Filed: 06/03/2020; Received: 06/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Fay, R.; Filed: 06/03/2020; Received: 06/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F); Filed By: Rosenfeld, S.; Filed: 03/05/2020; Received: 03/05/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed By: Rosenfeld, S.; Filed: 03/05/2020; Received: 03/05/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Spina, T.; Filed: 02/26/2020; Received: 02/26/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE TRUSTCO BANK CORP N Y S/H/A TRUSTCO BANK SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO TRUSTCO BANK, N.A. SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO HOME & CITY SAVINGS BANK SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO HOME SAVINGS BANK OF UPSTATE NEW YORK SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO HOME SAVINGS BANK OF THE CITY OF ALBANY; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 02/24/2020; Received: 02/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING THROUGH THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 02/24/2020; Received: 02/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ROBERT "BOBBY" ROCKWELL PERSONAL SERVICE; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 02/24/2020; Received: 02/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SCOTT J ROCKWELL PERSONAL SERVICE; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 02/24/2020; Received: 02/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ROBERT "BOBBY" ROCKWELL 3215 MAILING; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 02/21/2020; Received: 02/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ROBERT "BOBBY" ROCKWELL 1303 MAILING; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 02/21/2020; Received: 02/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING THROUGH THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT CERTIFIED MAILINGS; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 02/21/2020; Received: 02/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SCOTT J ROCKWELL 3215 MAILING; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 02/21/2020; Received: 02/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ALBANY COUNTY CLERK; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 02/20/2020; Received: 02/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 02/17/2020; Received: 02/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 02/17/2020; Received: 02/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 02/12/2020; Received: 02/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 02/12/2020; Received: 02/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 02/12/2020; Received: 02/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less