This case was last updated from Richmond County Courts on 02/07/2020 at 20:27:52 (UTC).

Nationstar Mortgage LLC d/b/a Champion Mortgage Company - v. - Public Administrator for Richmond County, as Administrator of the Estate of Mary T. Mungo a/k/a Mary Mungo et al

Case Summary

On 04/25/2017 Nationstar Mortgage LLC d/b/a Champion Mortgage Company filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Public Administrator for Richmond County, as Administrator of the Estate of Mary T Mungo a/k/a Mary Mungo. This case was filed in Richmond County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    04/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Richmond County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Richmond, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nationstar Mortgage LLC d/b/a Champion Mortgage Company

Defendants

Frank Mungo jr as Heir to the Estate of Mary T. Mungo a/k/a Mary Mungo

New York State Department of Taxation and Finance

Secretary of Housing and Urban Development

Michael Mungo as Heir to the Estate of Mary T. Mungo a/k/a Mary Mungo

JOHN DOE #1 through JOHN DOE #10 the last ten names being fictitious and unknown to the plaintiff, the person or parties intended being the persons or parties, if any, having or claiming an interest in or lien upon the Mortgaged premises described in

Public Administrator for Richmond County, as Administrator of the Estate of Mary T. Mungo a/k/a Mary Mungo

United States of America

New York City Parking Violations Bureau

New York City Transit Adjudication Bureau

New York City Environmental Control Board

Margaret Bonamo as Heir to the Estate of Mary T. Mungo a/k/a Mary Mungo

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

PINCUS, CARYN M

Attorney at Pincus Law Group, PLLC

MALONE, CYNTHIA LEE

Attorney at Pincus Law Group

Bolduc, Kristin Marie

Attorney at Woods Oviatt Gilman, LLP

ARAGONA, RENEE JENNIFER

Attorney at Pincus Law Group, PLLC

Defendant Attorneys

PASSARELLO, JOHN ALBERT

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF JOHN A. PASSARELLO, JR., ESQ.

SCHWARTZ, BETH PATRICIA

Attorney at U S ATTORNEY EASTERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK

 

Court Documents

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #003) Limited Letter of Administration

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #003) Limited Letter of Administration; Filed By: Malone, C.; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #003) Hold Harmless and indemnification affidavit

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #003) Hold Harmless and indemnification affidavit; Filed By: Malone, C.; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #003) Instruction Sheet

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #003) Instruction Sheet; Filed By: Malone, C.; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #003) Court Order

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #003) Court Order; Filed By: Malone, C.; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #003) Guardian Declined Appointment

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #003) Guardian Declined Appointment; Filed By: Malone, C.; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #003) Order appointing Substitute Guardian

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #003) Order appointing Substitute Guardian; Filed By: Malone, C.; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

AFFIRMATION (Motion #003)

AFFIRMATION (Motion #003); Filed By: Malone, C.; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #003)

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #003); Filed By: Malone, C.; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #003)

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #003); Filed By: Malone, C.; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE; Filed By: Bolduc, K. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 05/03/2017; Received: 05/03/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Bolduc, K. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 05/02/2017; Received: 05/02/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK CITY PARKING VIOLATIONS BUREAU

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK CITY PARKING VIOLATIONS BUREAU; Filed By: Bolduc, K. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 05/02/2017; Received: 05/02/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK CITY ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL BOARD

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK CITY ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL BOARD; Filed By: Bolduc, K. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 05/02/2017; Received: 05/02/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK CITY TRANSIT ADJUDICATION BUREAU

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK CITY TRANSIT ADJUDICATION BUREAU; Filed By: Bolduc, K. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 05/02/2017; Received: 05/02/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA; Filed By: Bolduc, K. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 05/02/2017; Received: 05/02/2017

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CLAIMS TO SURPLUS MONIES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CLAIMS TO SURPLUS MONIES; Filed By: Schwartz, B.; Filed: 05/02/2017; Received: 05/02/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Bolduc, K.; Filed: 04/25/2017; Received: 04/25/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Bolduc, K.; Filed: 04/25/2017; Received: 04/25/2017

56 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #003) Limited Letter of Administration; Filed By: Malone, C.; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #003) Hold Harmless and indemnification affidavit; Filed By: Malone, C.; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #003) Instruction Sheet; Filed By: Malone, C.; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #003) Court Order; Filed By: Malone, C.; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #003) Guardian Declined Appointment; Filed By: Malone, C.; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #003) Order appointing Substitute Guardian; Filed By: Malone, C.; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #003); Filed By: Malone, C.; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #003); Filed By: Malone, C.; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #003); Filed By: Malone, C.; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #003); Filed By: Malone, C.; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 05/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FRANK MUNGO; Filed By: Bolduc, K. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 05/09/2017; Received: 05/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE; Filed By: Bolduc, K. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 05/03/2017; Received: 05/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Bolduc, K. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 05/02/2017; Received: 05/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK CITY PARKING VIOLATIONS BUREAU; Filed By: Bolduc, K. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 05/02/2017; Received: 05/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK CITY ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL BOARD; Filed By: Bolduc, K. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 05/02/2017; Received: 05/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK CITY TRANSIT ADJUDICATION BUREAU; Filed By: Bolduc, K. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 05/02/2017; Received: 05/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA; Filed By: Bolduc, K. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 05/02/2017; Received: 05/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CLAIMS TO SURPLUS MONIES; Filed By: Schwartz, B.; Filed: 05/02/2017; Received: 05/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Bolduc, K.; Filed: 04/25/2017; Received: 04/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Bolduc, K.; Filed: 04/25/2017; Received: 04/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less