This case was last updated from Suffolk County Courts on 06/26/2020 at 18:45:35 (UTC).

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE, LLC, D/B/A CHAMPION MORTGAGE COMPANY - v. - Margaret Zegzula et al

Case Summary

On 07/20/2017 NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE, LLC, D/B/A CHAMPION MORTGAGE COMPANY filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Margaret Zegzula. This case was filed in Suffolk County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is James Hudson. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Suffolk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Suffolk, New York

Judge Details

Judge

James Hudson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE, LLC, D/B/A CHAMPION MORTGAGE COMPANY

Defendants

Discover Bank

Thomas Zegzula

Clerk of the Suffolk County Traffic & Parking Violations Agency

Margaret Zegzula a/k/a Margaret M. Zegzula

The United States of America acting through The Secretary of Housing and Urban Development

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DI CARO, JOHN A

Attorney at SHAPIRO, DICARO & BARAK, LLP

Defendant Attorney

SCHWARTZ, BETH PATRICIA

Attorney at U S ATTORNEY EASTERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 09/24/2019; Received: 09/24/2019

REFEREE REPORT OF SALE

REFEREE REPORT OF SALE; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 09/24/2019; Received: 09/24/2019

FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM

FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 09/18/2019; Received: 09/18/2019

NOTICE OF SALE

NOTICE OF SALE; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 08/13/2019; Received: 08/13/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY

NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 07/09/2019; Received: 07/09/2019

JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE

JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/10/2019; Received: 07/01/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - Q (Motion #002) Notice of Appearance

EXHIBIT(S) - Q (Motion #002) Notice of Appearance; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 11/21/2018; Received: 11/21/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - P (Motion #002) Affirmation of Services Rendered

EXHIBIT(S) - P (Motion #002) Affirmation of Services Rendered; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 11/21/2018; Received: 11/21/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - O (Motion #002) Referee's Oath and Report

EXHIBIT(S) - O (Motion #002) Referee's Oath and Report; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 11/21/2018; Received: 11/21/2018

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CLAIMS TO SURPLUS MONIES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CLAIMS TO SURPLUS MONIES; Filed By: Schwartz, B.; Filed: 08/10/2017; Received: 08/10/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE DISCOVER BANK

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE DISCOVER BANK; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 08/09/2017; Received: 08/09/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CLERK OF THE SUFFOLK COUNTY TRAFFIC & PARKING VIOLATIONS AGENCY

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CLERK OF THE SUFFOLK COUNTY TRAFFIC & PARKING VIOLATIONS AGENCY; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 08/08/2017; Received: 08/08/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING THROUGH THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING THROUGH THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 08/08/2017; Received: 08/08/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 08/07/2017; Received: 08/07/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING THROUGH THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING THROUGH THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 08/07/2017; Received: 08/07/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY (01 LOT) reverse mortgage

NOTICE OF PENDENCY (01 LOT) reverse mortgage; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

COMPLAINT reverse mortgage

COMPLAINT reverse mortgage; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

SUMMONS WITH NOTICE reverse mortgage

SUMMONS WITH NOTICE reverse mortgage; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

46 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 09/24/2019; Received: 09/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREFEREE REPORT OF SALE; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 09/24/2019; Received: 09/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 09/18/2019; Received: 09/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SALE; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 08/13/2019; Received: 08/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 07/09/2019; Received: 07/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/10/2019; Received: 07/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - Q (Motion #002) Notice of Appearance; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 11/21/2018; Received: 11/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - P (Motion #002) Affirmation of Services Rendered; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 11/21/2018; Received: 11/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - O (Motion #002) Referee's Oath and Report; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 11/21/2018; Received: 11/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - N (Motion #002) Notice of Entry; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 11/21/2018; Received: 11/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 08/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MARGARET ZEGZULA; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 08/16/2017; Received: 08/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CLAIMS TO SURPLUS MONIES; Filed By: Schwartz, B.; Filed: 08/10/2017; Received: 08/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE DISCOVER BANK; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 08/09/2017; Received: 08/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CLERK OF THE SUFFOLK COUNTY TRAFFIC & PARKING VIOLATIONS AGENCY; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 08/08/2017; Received: 08/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING THROUGH THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 08/08/2017; Received: 08/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 08/07/2017; Received: 08/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING THROUGH THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 08/07/2017; Received: 08/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY (01 LOT) reverse mortgage; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT reverse mortgage; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS WITH NOTICE reverse mortgage; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less