This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 01:57:50 (UTC).

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC D/B/A CHAMPION MORTGAGE COMPANY - v. - ELIZABETH GRADY A/K/A ELIZABETH G. AUSTIN A/K/A ELIZABETH GRADY AUSTIN et al

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC D/B/A CHAMPION MORTGAGE COMPANY filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ELIZABETH GRADY A/K/A ELIZABETH G AUSTIN A/K/A ELIZABETH GRADY AUSTIN. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC D/B/A CHAMPION MORTGAGE COMPANY

Defendants

ELIZABETH GRADY A/K/A ELIZABETH G. AUSTIN A/K/A ELIZABETH GRADY AUSTIN

JOHN DOE #1 THROUGH JOHN DOE #12 the last twelve names being fictitious and unknown to plaintiff, the persons or parties intended being the tenants, occupants, persons or corporations, if any, having or claiming an interest in or lien upon the premis

SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BORISKIN, SARA Z.

Attorney at RAS BORISKIN, LLC

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION Waiver

AFFIRMATION Waiver; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 01/29/2019; Received: 01/29/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS 3215 ELIZABETH GRADY

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS 3215 ELIZABETH GRADY; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/15/2017; Received: 06/15/2017

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) NOM TO DISCONTINUE THE ACTION AND TO CANCEL THE NOP

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) NOM TO DISCONTINUE THE ACTION AND TO CANCEL THE NOP; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ProVest,LLC by Mercedes Ramirez; Filed: 03/22/2019; Received: 03/22/2019

NOTICE OF PENDENCY NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1) AUTORIZATION FORM

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1) AUTORIZATION FORM; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ProVest,LLC by Mercedes Ramirez; Filed: 03/22/2019; Received: 03/22/2019

ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY dtd 5/14/19

ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY dtd 5/14/19; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/19/2019; Received: 06/21/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOD EARL GRADY - "JOHN DOE #1"

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOD EARL GRADY - "JOHN DOE #1"; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/15/2017; Received: 06/15/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS EARL GRADY - "JOHN DOE #1"

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS EARL GRADY - "JOHN DOE #1"; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/15/2017; Received: 06/15/2017

AFFIRMATION Consent

AFFIRMATION Consent; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 01/29/2019; Received: 01/29/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS ELIZABETH GRADY

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS ELIZABETH GRADY; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/15/2017; Received: 06/15/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS JOHN GRADY - "JOHN DOE #2"

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS JOHN GRADY - "JOHN DOE #2"; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/15/2017; Received: 06/15/2017

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1) ORDER DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELLING NOP

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1) ORDER DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELLING NOP; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ProVest,LLC by Mercedes Ramirez; Filed: 03/22/2019; Received: 03/22/2019

FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INTAKE FORM

FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INTAKE FORM; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/19/2019; Received: 02/20/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) AFFIRMATION OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) AFFIRMATION OF SERVICE; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ProVest,LLC by Mercedes Ramirez; Filed: 03/22/2019; Received: 03/22/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1) AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF DISCONTINUANCE OF ACTION, CANCELLATION OF NOP

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1) AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF DISCONTINUANCE OF ACTION, CANCELLATION OF NOP; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ProVest,LLC by Mercedes Ramirez; Filed: 03/22/2019; Received: 03/22/2019

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT CERTIFICATE OF MERIT NOT REQUIRED

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT CERTIFICATE OF MERIT NOT REQUIRED; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY dtd 5/14/19; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/19/2019; Received: 06/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1) AUTORIZATION FORM; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ProVest,LLC by Mercedes Ramirez; Filed: 03/22/2019; Received: 03/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #1) AFFIRMATION OF SERVICE; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ProVest,LLC by Mercedes Ramirez; Filed: 03/22/2019; Received: 03/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1) AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF DISCONTINUANCE OF ACTION, CANCELLATION OF NOP; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ProVest,LLC by Mercedes Ramirez; Filed: 03/22/2019; Received: 03/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1) ORDER DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELLING NOP; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ProVest,LLC by Mercedes Ramirez; Filed: 03/22/2019; Received: 03/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) NOM TO DISCONTINUE THE ACTION AND TO CANCEL THE NOP; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ProVest,LLC by Mercedes Ramirez; Filed: 03/22/2019; Received: 03/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INTAKE FORM; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/19/2019; Received: 02/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION Waiver; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 01/29/2019; Received: 01/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION Consent; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 01/29/2019; Received: 01/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 01/29/2019; Received: 01/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOD JOHN GRADY - "JOHN DOE #2"; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/15/2017; Received: 06/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS JOHN GRADY - "JOHN DOE #2"; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/15/2017; Received: 06/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOD EARL GRADY - "JOHN DOE #1"; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/15/2017; Received: 06/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS EARL GRADY - "JOHN DOE #1"; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/15/2017; Received: 06/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS 3215 ELIZABETH GRADY; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/15/2017; Received: 06/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS ELIZABETH GRADY; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/15/2017; Received: 06/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT CERTIFICATE OF MERIT NOT REQUIRED; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less