This case was last updated from Richmond County Courts on 02/14/2020 at 20:51:44 (UTC).

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC D/B/A CHAMPION MORTGAGE COMPANY - v. - DONALD MALECH et al

Case Summary

On 05/30/2017 NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC D/B/A CHAMPION MORTGAGE COMPANY filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against DONALD MALECH. This case was filed in Richmond County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    05/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Richmond County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Richmond, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC D/B/A CHAMPION MORTGAGE COMPANY

Defendants

BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE PORTAGE AVENUE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC.

Donald Malech AS ADMINISTRATOR AND AS HEIR TO THE ESTATE OF DOLORES MALECH

Dolores Malech AS HEIR TO THE ESTATE OF DOLORES MALECH

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING THROUGH THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT

Jason Paris AS HEIR TO THE ESTATE OF DOLORES MALECH

Danielle Paris AS HEIR TO THE ESTATE OF DOLORES MALECH

CRIMINAL COURT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK

NEW YORK CITY PARKING VIOLATIONS BUREAU

NEW YORK CITY ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL BOARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

VARGAS, STEPHEN JOHN

Attorney at Gross Polowy, LLC

Fox, Christine L.

Attorney at Gross Polowy LLC

POLOWY, AMY E.

Attorney at GROSS POLOWY LLC

PUSCHECK, KATHLEEN ELIZABETH

Attorney at Gross Polowy LLC

RICCIARDI, JOHN JOSEPH

Attorney at GROSS POLOWY, LLC

HEANEY, ALEXANDRA ROSE

Attorney at Gross Polowy LLC

GRUBEA, JESSICA JOY

Attorney at Gross Polowy, LLC

CASTER, AUSTIN ROBERT

Attorney at Gross Polowy, LLC

EISENBERG, ROSS

Attorney at Hasbani & Light P.C.

ROSENFELD, STEVEN

Attorney at Gross Polowy LLC

Defendant Attorney

SCHWARTZ, BETH PATRICIA

Attorney at U S ATTORNEY EASTERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK

 

Court Documents

ORDER - MOTION - SHORT FORM (Motion #003)

ORDER - MOTION - SHORT FORM (Motion #003); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/04/2019; Received: 10/04/2019

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #003)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #003); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/02/2019; Received: 05/06/2019

RECEIPT OF PAYMENT INTO COURT

RECEIPT OF PAYMENT INTO COURT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/11/2019; Received: 04/11/2019

REFEREE REPORT OF SALE

REFEREE REPORT OF SALE; Filed By: Ricciardi, J.; Filed: 04/01/2019; Received: 04/01/2019

FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM

FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM; Filed By: Ricciardi, J.; Filed: 04/01/2019; Received: 04/01/2019

FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM

FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/04/2019; Received: 03/04/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #002)

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #002); Filed By: Rosenfeld, S.; Filed: 01/08/2019; Received: 01/08/2019

JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE entered in the office of the County Clerk on December 10, 2018

JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE entered in the office of the County Clerk on December 10, 2018; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/10/2018; Received: 12/10/2018

ORDER AND JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE & SALE (Motion #002)

ORDER AND JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE & SALE (Motion #002); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/10/2018; Received: 12/10/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 06/14/2017; Received: 06/14/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 06/13/2017; Received: 06/13/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 06/13/2017; Received: 06/13/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CRIMINAL COURT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CRIMINAL COURT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 06/13/2017; Received: 06/13/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK CITY ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL BOARD

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK CITY ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL BOARD; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 06/13/2017; Received: 06/13/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 06/13/2017; Received: 06/13/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK CITY PARKING VIOLATIONS BUREAU

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK CITY PARKING VIOLATIONS BUREAU; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 06/13/2017; Received: 06/13/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Puscheck, K.; Filed: 05/30/2017; Received: 05/30/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Puscheck, K.; Filed: 05/30/2017; Received: 05/30/2017

70 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - MOTION - SHORT FORM (Motion #003); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/04/2019; Received: 10/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #003); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/02/2019; Received: 05/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT OF PAYMENT INTO COURT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/11/2019; Received: 04/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREFEREE REPORT OF SALE; Filed By: Ricciardi, J.; Filed: 04/01/2019; Received: 04/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM; Filed By: Ricciardi, J.; Filed: 04/01/2019; Received: 04/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/04/2019; Received: 03/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #002); Filed By: Rosenfeld, S.; Filed: 01/08/2019; Received: 01/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE entered in the office of the County Clerk on December 10, 2018; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/10/2018; Received: 12/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER AND JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE & SALE (Motion #002); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/10/2018; Received: 12/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES (Motion #002); Filed By: Fox, C.; Filed: 10/05/2018; Received: 10/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
62 More Docket Entries
  • 06/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PORTAGE AVENUE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC.; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 06/14/2017; Received: 06/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 06/14/2017; Received: 06/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 06/13/2017; Received: 06/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 06/13/2017; Received: 06/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CRIMINAL COURT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 06/13/2017; Received: 06/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK CITY ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL BOARD; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 06/13/2017; Received: 06/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 06/13/2017; Received: 06/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK CITY PARKING VIOLATIONS BUREAU; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 06/13/2017; Received: 06/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Puscheck, K.; Filed: 05/30/2017; Received: 05/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Puscheck, K.; Filed: 05/30/2017; Received: 05/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less