This case was last updated from Suffolk County Courts on 06/26/2020 at 18:42:38 (UTC).

National Liability & Fire Insurance Company - v. - Tyease Guest et al

Case Summary

On 07/20/2017 National Liability Fire Insurance Company filed an Other lawsuit against Tyease Guest. This case was filed in Suffolk County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is William B Rebolini. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Suffolk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Suffolk, New York

Judge Details

Judge

William B Rebolini

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

National Liability & Fire Insurance Company

Defendants

Tyease Guest

State Farm Fire and Casualty Company

Iris Mcallister

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCGOVERN, BRIAN J

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF BRIAN J. MCGOVERN, LLC

Defendant Attorneys

HASSIN, SHANE SAMUEL

Attorney at HASSIN LAW GROUP

HALPERN, RICHARD I

Attorney at RICHARD T. LAU & ASSOCIATES

MULLE, RICHARD C

Attorney at RICHARD C MULLE

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI); Filed By: Mcgovern, B.; Filed: 09/11/2018; Received: 09/11/2018

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #002)

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #002); Filed By: Mulle, R.; Filed: 05/07/2018; Received: 05/07/2018

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002)

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/04/2018; Received: 05/04/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002); Filed By: Mcgovern, B.; Filed: 02/06/2018; Received: 02/06/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) State Farm's Counsel's November 28, 2017 Correspondence

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) State Farm's Counsel's November 28, 2017 Correspondence; Filed By: Mcgovern, B.; Filed: 02/06/2018; Received: 02/06/2018

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #002)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #002); Filed By: Mcgovern, B.; Filed: 02/06/2018; Received: 02/06/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002); Filed By: Mulle, R.; Filed: 02/06/2018; Received: 02/06/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - A-C (Motion #002) polic report, affidvait of Iris McAllister, letter from Rankin County tax collector

EXHIBIT(S) - A-C (Motion #002) polic report, affidvait of Iris McAllister, letter from Rankin County tax collector; Filed By: Mulle, R.; Filed: 02/06/2018; Received: 02/06/2018

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #002)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #002); Filed By: Mulle, R.; Filed: 02/06/2018; Received: 02/06/2018

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION; Filed By: Mcgovern, B.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - E Discovery Demands

EXHIBIT(S) - E Discovery Demands; Filed By: Mcgovern, B.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - D State Farm Correspondence

EXHIBIT(S) - D State Farm Correspondence; Filed By: Mcgovern, B.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - C Title and Registration

EXHIBIT(S) - C Title and Registration; Filed By: Mcgovern, B.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - B Police Accident Report Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - B Police Accident Report Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Mcgovern, B.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A Notice of Intention to Arbitrate

EXHIBIT(S) - A Notice of Intention to Arbitrate; Filed By: Mcgovern, B.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

OATH

OATH; Filed By: Mcgovern, B.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #001)

NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #001); Filed By: Mcgovern, B.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

PETITION

PETITION; Filed By: Mcgovern, B.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI); Filed By: Mcgovern, B.; Filed: 09/11/2018; Received: 09/11/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #002); Filed By: Mulle, R.; Filed: 05/07/2018; Received: 05/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/04/2018; Received: 05/04/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002); Filed By: Mcgovern, B.; Filed: 02/06/2018; Received: 02/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) State Farm's Counsel's November 28, 2017 Correspondence; Filed By: Mcgovern, B.; Filed: 02/06/2018; Received: 02/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #002); Filed By: Mcgovern, B.; Filed: 02/06/2018; Received: 02/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002); Filed By: Mulle, R.; Filed: 02/06/2018; Received: 02/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A-C (Motion #002) polic report, affidvait of Iris McAllister, letter from Rankin County tax collector; Filed By: Mulle, R.; Filed: 02/06/2018; Received: 02/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #002); Filed By: Mulle, R.; Filed: 02/06/2018; Received: 02/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002); Filed By: Mcgovern, B.; Filed: 01/12/2018; Received: 01/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001); Filed By: Mcgovern, B.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION; Filed By: Mcgovern, B.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E Discovery Demands; Filed By: Mcgovern, B.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D State Farm Correspondence; Filed By: Mcgovern, B.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Title and Registration; Filed By: Mcgovern, B.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Police Accident Report Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Mcgovern, B.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Notice of Intention to Arbitrate; Filed By: Mcgovern, B.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOATH; Filed By: Mcgovern, B.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #001); Filed By: Mcgovern, B.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION; Filed By: Mcgovern, B.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less