This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 01:38:11 (UTC).

Naomi Nelson - v. - New York City Transit Authority

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 Naomi Nelson filed an Other lawsuit against New York City Transit Authority. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Naomi Nelson

Defendant

New York City Transit Authority

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

RENNA, ROBERT J

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF ROBERT J. RENNA, P.C.

RENNA, ROBERT J.

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF ROBERT J. RENNA, P.C.

 

Court Documents

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY Note of Issue

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY Note of Issue; Filed By: Renna, R.; Filed: 03/29/2019; Received: 03/29/2019

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/24/2018; Received: 04/25/2018

ORDER - OTHER Dated 11/27/2018

ORDER - OTHER Dated 11/27/2018; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/06/2018; Received: 12/10/2018

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Renna, R.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Renna, R. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 06/27/2017; Received: 06/27/2017

ORDER - OTHER Pre-Calendar Order

ORDER - OTHER Pre-Calendar Order; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/13/2017; Received: 12/06/2017

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Renna, R.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Renna, R. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 06/27/2017; Received: 06/27/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Renna, R.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY Note of Issue; Filed By: Renna, R.; Filed: 03/29/2019; Received: 03/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER Dated 11/27/2018; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/06/2018; Received: 12/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/24/2018; Received: 04/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER Pre-Calendar Order; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/13/2017; Received: 12/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Renna, R.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Renna, R.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Renna, R. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 06/27/2017; Received: 06/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Renna, R. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 06/27/2017; Received: 06/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Renna, R.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less