This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 10/13/2021 at 09:22:44 (UTC).

Nancy Stepkowski v. The Town of Oyster Bay et al

Case Summary

On 08/02/2021 Nancy Stepkowski filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against The Town of Oyster Bay. This case was filed in Nassau County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2021

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Nassau, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nancy Stepkowski

Defendants

The Town of Oyster Bay

The County of Nassau

The Hogan Group NY, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GENIS, ROBERT JOEL

Attorney at Sonin & Genis Attorneys At Law LLC

Defendant Attorneys

GOETZ, SAMANTHA ASHLEY

Attorney at Oyster Bay Town Attorney

CURRAN, JOANNE THERESA

Attorney at Nassau County Attorney's Office

YONG, JEFFREY P

Attorney at Martyn Martyn Smith Murray & Yong

 

Court Documents

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION; Filed By: Goetz, S.; Filed: 10/12/2021; Received: 10/12/2021

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT; Filed By: Goetz, S.; Filed: 10/12/2021; Received: 10/12/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - D Affidavit of Cindy Maloney

EXHIBIT(S) - D Affidavit of Cindy Maloney; Filed By: Goetz, S.; Filed: 10/12/2021; Received: 10/12/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - C Affidavit of Kenneth Bishop

EXHIBIT(S) - C Affidavit of Kenneth Bishop; Filed By: Goetz, S.; Filed: 10/12/2021; Received: 10/12/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - B Summons and Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - B Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Goetz, S.; Filed: 10/12/2021; Received: 10/12/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - A Notice of Claim

EXHIBIT(S) - A Notice of Claim; Filed By: Goetz, S.; Filed: 10/12/2021; Received: 10/12/2021

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION; Filed By: Goetz, S.; Filed: 10/12/2021; Received: 10/12/2021

NOTICE OF MOTION

NOTICE OF MOTION; Filed By: Goetz, S.; Filed: 10/12/2021; Received: 10/12/2021

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER; Filed By: Curran, J.; Filed: 09/14/2021; Received: 09/14/2021

AFFIDAVIT ATTY CERTIFICATION

AFFIDAVIT ATTY CERTIFICATION; Filed By: Yong, J.; Filed: 08/19/2021; Received: 08/19/2021

ANSWER ANSWER

ANSWER ANSWER; Filed By: Yong, J.; Filed: 08/19/2021; Received: 08/19/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - D Response from Nassau County

EXHIBIT(S) - D Response from Nassau County; Filed By: Genis, R.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - C Notice of Claim served upon County of Nassau

EXHIBIT(S) - C Notice of Claim served upon County of Nassau; Filed By: Genis, R.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - B Response from Oyster Bay

EXHIBIT(S) - B Response from Oyster Bay; Filed By: Genis, R.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - A Notice of Claim served upon Oyster Bay

EXHIBIT(S) - A Notice of Claim served upon Oyster Bay; Filed By: Genis, R.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT; Filed By: Genis, R.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

SUMMONS

SUMMONS; Filed By: Genis, R.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION; Filed By: Goetz, S.; Filed: 10/12/2021; Received: 10/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT; Filed By: Goetz, S.; Filed: 10/12/2021; Received: 10/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D Affidavit of Cindy Maloney; Filed By: Goetz, S.; Filed: 10/12/2021; Received: 10/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Affidavit of Kenneth Bishop; Filed By: Goetz, S.; Filed: 10/12/2021; Received: 10/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Goetz, S.; Filed: 10/12/2021; Received: 10/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Notice of Claim; Filed By: Goetz, S.; Filed: 10/12/2021; Received: 10/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION; Filed By: Goetz, S.; Filed: 10/12/2021; Received: 10/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION; Filed By: Goetz, S.; Filed: 10/12/2021; Received: 10/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER; Filed By: Curran, J.; Filed: 09/14/2021; Received: 09/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT ATTY CERTIFICATION; Filed By: Yong, J.; Filed: 08/19/2021; Received: 08/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER ANSWER; Filed By: Yong, J.; Filed: 08/19/2021; Received: 08/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D Response from Nassau County; Filed By: Genis, R.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Notice of Claim served upon County of Nassau; Filed By: Genis, R.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Response from Oyster Bay; Filed By: Genis, R.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Notice of Claim served upon Oyster Bay; Filed By: Genis, R.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Filed By: Genis, R.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS; Filed By: Genis, R.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less