This case was last updated from Queens County Courts on 04/17/2021 at 18:15:44 (UTC).

NACHELLE COLIN v. DEVON Anthony KING et al

Case Summary

On 09/09/2020 NACHELLE COLIN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DEVON Anthony KING. This case was filed in Queens County Courts, Queens County Supreme Court Civil Term - 1 located in Orange, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Denis Butler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2020

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Queens, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Denis Butler

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nachelle Colin

Defendants

Derrick Gowie

Morais Dicks

The Estate of Ilena Thomas

Devon Anthony King

Equity Settlement Services, Inc.

The Estate of Alecia Salmon

Franklin Salmon

Progressive Homes and Development

Mark Crawford

Not Yet Classified

Ikiesha T Al-shabazz

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NORGAISSE, ANNEL-STEPHAN

Defendant and Not Yet Classified Attorneys

AL-SHABAZZ, IKIESHA TAQUET

OLIVER, ISHELLI LUENA

 

Court Documents

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Al-Shabazz, I.; Filed: 03/22/2021; Received: 03/22/2021

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/18/2021; Received: 03/18/2021

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/10/2021; Received: 02/10/2021

REQUEST FOR PRE-MOTION CONFERENCE (COMPLIANCE PART)

REQUEST FOR PRE-MOTION CONFERENCE (COMPLIANCE PART); Filed By: Norgaisse, A.; Filed: 01/12/2021; Received: 01/12/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001); Filed By: Al-Shabazz, I.; Filed: 01/04/2021; Received: 01/04/2021

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION (Motion #001)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Al-Shabazz, I.; Filed: 01/04/2021; Received: 01/04/2021

EXHIBIT(S)

Retainer and Invoice

EXHIBIT(S)

Post Closing Escrow Agreement

EXHIBIT(S)

Title Report and Violations

PROOF OF SERVICE

--none--

ANSWER

--none--

ANSWER

--none--

COMPLAINT

--none--

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Smith, E.; Filed: 09/23/2020; Received: 09/23/2020

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DEMAND FOR A COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DEMAND FOR A COMPLAINT; Filed By: Oliver, I.; Filed: 09/23/2020; Received: 09/23/2020

DEMAND FOR COMPLAINT

DEMAND FOR COMPLAINT; Filed By: Al-Shabazz, I.; Filed: 09/22/2020; Received: 09/22/2020

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Al-Shabazz, I.; Filed: 09/22/2020; Received: 09/22/2020

SUMMONS WITH NOTICE

SUMMONS WITH NOTICE; Filed By: Norgaisse, A.; Filed: 09/09/2020; Received: 09/09/2020

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Al-Shabazz, I.; Filed: 03/22/2021; Received: 03/22/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/18/2021; Received: 03/18/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/10/2021; Received: 02/10/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRE-MOTION CONFERENCE (COMPLIANCE PART); Filed By: Norgaisse, A.; Filed: 01/12/2021; Received: 01/12/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001); Filed By: Al-Shabazz, I.; Filed: 01/04/2021; Received: 01/04/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Al-Shabazz, I.; Filed: 01/04/2021; Received: 01/04/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Retainer and Invoice; Filed By: Norgaisse, A.; Filed: 12/11/2020; Received: 12/11/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Post Closing Escrow Agreement; Filed By: Norgaisse, A.; Filed: 12/11/2020; Received: 12/11/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Title Report and Violations; Filed By: Norgaisse, A.; Filed: 12/11/2020; Received: 12/11/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Contract of Sale; Filed By: Norgaisse, A.; Filed: 12/11/2020; Received: 12/11/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Al-Shabazz, I.; Filed: 11/25/2020; Received: 11/25/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Oliver, I.; Filed: 11/18/2020; Received: 11/18/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Oliver, I.; Filed: 11/18/2020; Received: 11/18/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Smith, E.; Filed: 11/18/2020; Received: 11/18/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Filed By: Norgaisse, A.; Filed: 10/20/2020; Received: 10/20/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Smith, E.; Filed: 09/23/2020; Received: 09/23/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DEMAND FOR A COMPLAINT; Filed By: Oliver, I.; Filed: 09/23/2020; Received: 09/23/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR COMPLAINT; Filed By: Al-Shabazz, I.; Filed: 09/22/2020; Received: 09/22/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Al-Shabazz, I.; Filed: 09/22/2020; Received: 09/22/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS WITH NOTICE; Filed By: Norgaisse, A.; Filed: 09/09/2020; Received: 09/09/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less