This case was last updated from Bronx County Courts on 05/02/2020 at 23:59:36 (UTC).

Muzammil Rabbani - v. - Superior Apartments LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/22/2018 Muzammil Rabbani filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Superior Apartments LLC. This case was filed in Bronx County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******018E

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Bronx, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Muzammil Rabbani

Defendants

Superior Apartments LLC

Abdul M. Khan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NACINOVICH, ANNE C

Attorney at Bronx Legal Services

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED DATED 6/20/2019

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED DATED 6/20/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/18/2019; Received: 07/18/2019

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION); Filed By: Nacinovich, A.; Filed: 06/06/2019; Received: 06/06/2019

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) Copy of Defendants' Counsel's Notice of Appearance

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) Copy of Defendants' Counsel's Notice of Appearance; Filed By: Nacinovich, A.; Filed: 06/06/2019; Received: 06/06/2019

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ); Filed By: Nacinovich, A.; Filed: 06/06/2019; Received: 06/06/2019

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001) SHORT FORM ORDER & SIGNED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE DATED 1/23/2019

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001) SHORT FORM ORDER & SIGNED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE DATED 1/23/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/24/2019; Received: 01/24/2019

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001) corrected document type

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001) corrected document type; Filed By: Nacinovich, A.; Filed: 11/07/2018; Received: 11/07/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Proposed) Order for Default

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Proposed) Order for Default; Filed By: Nacinovich, A.; Filed: 11/02/2018; Received: 11/02/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - C Servico Affidavit for Defendant Superior Apt

EXHIBIT(S) - C Servico Affidavit for Defendant Superior Apt; Filed By: Nacinovich, A.; Filed: 11/02/2018; Received: 11/02/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - B Davis Affidavits for Defendant Khan

EXHIBIT(S) - B Davis Affidavits for Defendant Khan; Filed By: Nacinovich, A.; Filed: 11/02/2018; Received: 11/02/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - A Verified Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - A Verified Complaint; Filed By: Nacinovich, A.; Filed: 11/02/2018; Received: 11/02/2018

AFFIRMATION Attorney Affirmation

AFFIRMATION Attorney Affirmation; Filed By: Nacinovich, A.; Filed: 11/02/2018; Received: 11/02/2018

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION); Filed By: Nacinovich, A.; Filed: 11/02/2018; Received: 11/02/2018

RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RJI

RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RJI; Filed By: Nacinovich, A.; Filed: 11/02/2018; Received: 11/02/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavits of Service for both Defendants

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavits of Service for both Defendants; Filed By: Nacinovich, A.; Filed: 07/18/2018; Received: 07/18/2018

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION); Filed By: Nacinovich, A.; Filed: 06/22/2018; Received: 06/22/2018

COMPLAINT *Corrected* Verified Complaint

COMPLAINT *Corrected* Verified Complaint; Filed By: Nacinovich, A.; Filed: 06/22/2018; Received: 06/25/2018

SUMMONS *Corrected* Summons

SUMMONS *Corrected* Summons; Filed By: Nacinovich, A.; Filed: 06/22/2018; Received: 06/25/2018

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED DATED 6/20/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/18/2019; Received: 07/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION); Filed By: Nacinovich, A.; Filed: 06/06/2019; Received: 06/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) Copy of Defendants' Counsel's Notice of Appearance; Filed By: Nacinovich, A.; Filed: 06/06/2019; Received: 06/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ); Filed By: Nacinovich, A.; Filed: 06/06/2019; Received: 06/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001) SHORT FORM ORDER & SIGNED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE DATED 1/23/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/24/2019; Received: 01/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001) corrected document type; Filed By: Nacinovich, A.; Filed: 11/07/2018; Received: 11/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Proposed) Order for Default; Filed By: Nacinovich, A.; Filed: 11/02/2018; Received: 11/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Servico Affidavit for Defendant Superior Apt; Filed By: Nacinovich, A.; Filed: 11/02/2018; Received: 11/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Davis Affidavits for Defendant Khan; Filed By: Nacinovich, A.; Filed: 11/02/2018; Received: 11/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Verified Complaint; Filed By: Nacinovich, A.; Filed: 11/02/2018; Received: 11/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION Attorney Affirmation; Filed By: Nacinovich, A.; Filed: 11/02/2018; Received: 11/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION); Filed By: Nacinovich, A.; Filed: 11/02/2018; Received: 11/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RJI; Filed By: Nacinovich, A.; Filed: 11/02/2018; Received: 11/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavits of Service for both Defendants; Filed By: Nacinovich, A.; Filed: 07/18/2018; Received: 07/18/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION); Filed By: Nacinovich, A.; Filed: 06/22/2018; Received: 06/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT *Corrected* Verified Complaint; Filed By: Nacinovich, A.; Filed: 06/22/2018; Received: 06/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS *Corrected* Summons; Filed By: Nacinovich, A.; Filed: 06/22/2018; Received: 06/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less