This case was last updated from New York County Courts on 06/24/2020 at 18:11:25 (UTC).

Murray House Owners Corp, - v. - Jessica Beldon

Case Summary

On 01/22/2018 Murray House Owners Corp filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Jessica Beldon. This case was filed in New York County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Frank P Nervo. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2018

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    New York, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Frank P Nervo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Murray House Owners Corp,

Defendant

Jessica Beldon

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CLARK, NAEEMAH

Attorney at WESTERMAN BALL EDERER MILLER & SHARFSTEIN LLP

MILLER, JEFFREY A

Attorney at WESTERMAN BALL EDERER MILLER ZUCKER & SHARFSTEIN, LLP

ZUCKER, GREG S

Attorney at WESTERMAN BALL EDERER MILLER ZUCKER & SHARFSTEIN, LLP

Defendant Attorney

Beldon, Jessica

 

Court Documents

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION

--none--

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

--none--

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130

--none--

EXHIBIT(S)

Timeline of emails and phone calls from Plaintiff/Plaintiffs Attorneys and Defendant.

EXHIBIT(S)

Emails from Janeth Donovan at Solstice group (Property Management) notifying me of legal fees being charged to me. These emails include several requests for an itemized bill (no response).

EXHIBIT(S)

October 16, 2018 email to Plaintiff and Plaintiffs attorneys to notify all parties that my mother would be convalescing with me for 3 weeks post-surgery and that the second dog will be in the building with a departure date of November 4, 2018.

EXHIBIT(S)

September 12, 2018 email to Plaintiffs attorneys confirming the removal of the second dog.

EXHIBIT(S)

July 23, 2018 email to Plaintiffs attorneys giving notice that the dog has been removed to Florida which includes a potential solution to keep both dogs (no response given).

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION

--none--

NOTICE OF MOTION

--none--

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE

--none--

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

--none--

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

--none--

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

ANSWER

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

Jessica Beldon

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

--none--

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/15/2019; Received: 03/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Clark, N.; Filed: 03/04/2019; Received: 03/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 (Motion #001); Filed By: Clark, N.; Filed: 02/20/2019; Received: 02/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) Timeline of emails and phone calls from Plaintiff/Plaintiffs Attorneys and Defendant.; Filed By: Beldon, J. (Pro Hac / Pro Se); Filed: 02/04/2019; Received: 02/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Emails from Janeth Donovan at Solstice group (Property Management) notifying me of legal fees being charged to me. These emails include several requests for an itemized bill (no response).; Filed By: Beldon, J. (Pro Hac / Pro Se); Filed: 02/04/2019; Received: 02/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) October 16, 2018 email to Plaintiff and Plaintiffs attorneys to notify all parties that my mother would be convalescing with me for 3 weeks post-surgery and that the second dog will be in the building with a departure date of November 4, 2018.; Filed By: Beldon, J. (Pro Hac / Pro Se); Filed: 02/04/2019; Received: 02/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) September 12, 2018 email to Plaintiffs attorneys confirming the removal of the second dog.; Filed By: Beldon, J. (Pro Hac / Pro Se); Filed: 02/04/2019; Received: 02/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) July 23, 2018 email to Plaintiffs attorneys giving notice that the dog has been removed to Florida which includes a potential solution to keep both dogs (no response given).; Filed By: Beldon, J. (Pro Hac / Pro Se); Filed: 02/04/2019; Received: 02/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Beldon, J. (Pro Hac / Pro Se); Filed: 02/04/2019; Received: 02/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) *Corrected*; Filed By: Beldon, J. (Pro Hac / Pro Se); Filed: 02/04/2019; Received: 02/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/21/2018; Received: 11/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/31/2018; Received: 05/31/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Clark, N.; Filed: 02/20/2018; Received: 02/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Clark, N.; Filed: 02/20/2018; Received: 02/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Beldon, J. (Pro Hac / Pro Se); Filed: 02/16/2018; Received: 02/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Beldon, J. (Pro Hac / Pro Se); Filed: 02/16/2018; Received: 02/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Jessica Beldon; Filed By: Zucker, G.; Filed: 02/12/2018; Received: 02/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Clark, N.; Filed: 01/22/2018; Received: 01/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less