This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 04/26/2020 at 12:52:12 (UTC).

MTGLQ INVESTORS, L.P. v. DENNIS PHILLIPS et al

Case Summary

On 03/20/2018 MTGLQ INVESTORS, L P filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against DENNIS PHILLIPS. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2018

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MTGLQ INVESTORS, L.P.

Defendants

NEW YORK CITY PARKING VIOLATIONS BUREAU

Gamilah Phillips

STATE OF NEW YORK

Dennis Phillips

NEW YORK CITY ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL BOARD

John Phillips

COMMISSIONER OF JURORS

NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE

NEW YORK CITY TRANSIT ADJUDICATION BUREAU

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LUKINA, OXANA

Attorney at Oxana Lukina

MANFRO, JORDAN JAYCE

Attorney at KNUCKLES, KOMOSINSKI, & MANFRO, LLP

Defendant Attorney

SHOEMAKER, AUTUMN

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Lukina, O.; Filed: 06/04/2019; Received: 06/04/2019

ORDER - REFERENCE (Motion #1)

ORDER - REFERENCE (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Lukina, O.; Filed: 01/09/2019; Received: 01/09/2019

NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) (Motion #1) *Corrected*

NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) (Motion #1) *Corrected*; Filed By: Lukina, O.; Filed: 01/09/2019; Received: 01/09/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #1) Affidavit of Non Military

EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #1) Affidavit of Non Military; Filed By: Lukina, O.; Filed: 01/08/2019; Received: 01/08/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1); Filed By: Lukina, O.; Filed: 01/08/2019; Received: 01/08/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1); Filed By: Lukina, O.; Filed: 01/08/2019; Received: 01/08/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #1) Appearance Detail

EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #1) Appearance Detail; Filed By: Lukina, O.; Filed: 01/08/2019; Received: 01/08/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #1) Answer

EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #1) Answer; Filed By: Lukina, O.; Filed: 01/08/2019; Received: 01/08/2019

AFFIDAVIT JOHN PHILLIPS DOE(DOE MAILING)

AFFIDAVIT JOHN PHILLIPS DOE(DOE MAILING); Filed By: Schoenbart, S. - filed by Cattani, D.; Filed: 03/29/2018; Received: 03/29/2018

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F); Filed By: Suttell, M. - filed by Cattani, D.; Filed: 03/29/2018; Received: 03/29/2018

RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed By: Suttell, M. - filed by Cattani, D.; Filed: 03/29/2018; Received: 03/29/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Suttell, M. - filed by Cattani, D.; Filed: 03/29/2018; Received: 03/29/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOM

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOM; Filed By: Suttell, M. - filed by Cattani, D.; Filed: 03/29/2018; Received: 03/29/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Schoenbart, S. - filed by Sierra, S.; Filed: 03/20/2018; Received: 03/20/2018

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Schoenbart, S. - filed by Sierra, S.; Filed: 03/20/2018; Received: 03/20/2018

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Schoenbart, S. - filed by Sierra, S.; Filed: 03/20/2018; Received: 03/20/2018

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Schoenbart, S. - filed by Sierra, S.; Filed: 03/20/2018; Received: 03/20/2018

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Lukina, O.; Filed: 06/04/2019; Received: 06/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - REFERENCE (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Lukina, O.; Filed: 01/09/2019; Received: 01/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) (Motion #1) *Corrected*; Filed By: Lukina, O.; Filed: 01/09/2019; Received: 01/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #1) Affidavit of Non Military; Filed By: Lukina, O.; Filed: 01/08/2019; Received: 01/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1); Filed By: Lukina, O.; Filed: 01/08/2019; Received: 01/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1); Filed By: Lukina, O.; Filed: 01/08/2019; Received: 01/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #1) Appearance Detail; Filed By: Lukina, O.; Filed: 01/08/2019; Received: 01/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #1) Answer; Filed By: Lukina, O.; Filed: 01/08/2019; Received: 01/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service with Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Lukina, O.; Filed: 01/08/2019; Received: 01/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 03/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Schoenbart, S. - filed by Cattani, D.; Filed: 03/29/2018; Received: 03/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT JOHN PHILLIPS DOE(DOE MAILING); Filed By: Schoenbart, S. - filed by Cattani, D.; Filed: 03/29/2018; Received: 03/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F); Filed By: Suttell, M. - filed by Cattani, D.; Filed: 03/29/2018; Received: 03/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed By: Suttell, M. - filed by Cattani, D.; Filed: 03/29/2018; Received: 03/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Suttell, M. - filed by Cattani, D.; Filed: 03/29/2018; Received: 03/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOM; Filed By: Suttell, M. - filed by Cattani, D.; Filed: 03/29/2018; Received: 03/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Schoenbart, S. - filed by Sierra, S.; Filed: 03/20/2018; Received: 03/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Schoenbart, S. - filed by Sierra, S.; Filed: 03/20/2018; Received: 03/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Schoenbart, S. - filed by Sierra, S.; Filed: 03/20/2018; Received: 03/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Schoenbart, S. - filed by Sierra, S.; Filed: 03/20/2018; Received: 03/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less