This case was last updated from Broome County Courts on 09/24/2022 at 19:22:01 (UTC).

M&T BANK v. SCOTT J FABER et al

Case Summary

On 12/03/2021 M T BANK filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against SCOTT J FABER. This case was filed in Broome County Courts, Supreme Court located in Orange, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Joseph F Cawley. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2841

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Broome, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Joseph F Cawley

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

M&T BANK

Defendants

Scott J Faber A/K/A SCOTT FABER

NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE

UNITED HEALTH SERVICES HOSPITALS INC.

John Doe

Scott Faber

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MULLEN, RICHARD S

GRIGG, NATALIE ANN

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) (Motion #2) Filed by CAB

NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) (Motion #2) Filed by CAB; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 07/14/2022; Received: 07/14/2022

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT NOTICE OF ASSIGNED MOTION DATE

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT NOTICE OF ASSIGNED MOTION DATE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/14/2022; Received: 07/14/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) supplement documents Possible SSN Administratively Redacted

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) supplement documents Possible SSN Administratively Redacted; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 07/12/2022; Received: 07/12/2022

BILL OF COSTS (Motion #2)

BILL OF COSTS (Motion #2); Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 07/12/2022; Received: 07/12/2022

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #2)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #2); Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 07/12/2022; Received: 07/12/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #2)

PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #2); Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 07/12/2022; Received: 07/12/2022

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #2)

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #2); Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 07/12/2022; Received: 07/12/2022

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2) filed by bmb

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2) filed by bmb; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 07/12/2022; Received: 07/12/2022

OATH 104983-1 stmnt/report of amnt due. AZH

OATH 104983-1 stmnt/report of amnt due. AZH; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 06/01/2022; Received: 06/01/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Mullen, R. - filed by Class Action LLC; Filed: 12/28/2021; Received: 12/28/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Mullen, R. - filed by Class Action LLC; Filed: 12/28/2021; Received: 12/28/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Mullen, R. - filed by Class Action LLC; Filed: 12/28/2021; Received: 12/28/2021

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Mullen, R. - filed by Class Action LLC; Filed: 12/20/2021; Received: 12/20/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Mullen, R. - filed by Class Action LLC; Filed: 12/20/2021; Received: 12/20/2021

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Closing USA; Filed: 12/03/2021; Received: 12/03/2021

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Closing USA; Filed: 12/03/2021; Received: 12/03/2021

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Closing USA; Filed: 12/03/2021; Received: 12/03/2021

SUMMONS & COMPLAINT W/PROOF OF SVC OF HARDSHIP DECL. & AFF. STATING NO RECEIPT OF HARDSHIP DECL.

SUMMONS & COMPLAINT W/PROOF OF SVC OF HARDSHIP DECL. & AFF. STATING NO RECEIPT OF HARDSHIP DECL.; Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Closing USA; Filed: 12/03/2021; Received: 12/03/2021

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) (Motion #2) Filed by CAB; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 07/14/2022; Received: 07/14/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT NOTICE OF ASSIGNED MOTION DATE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/14/2022; Received: 07/14/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) supplement documents Possible SSN Administratively Redacted; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 07/12/2022; Received: 07/12/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBILL OF COSTS (Motion #2); Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 07/12/2022; Received: 07/12/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #2); Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 07/12/2022; Received: 07/12/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #2); Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 07/12/2022; Received: 07/12/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #2); Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 07/12/2022; Received: 07/12/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2) filed by bmb; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 07/12/2022; Received: 07/12/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOATH 104983-1 stmnt/report of amnt due. AZH; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 06/01/2022; Received: 06/01/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOATH 104983-1 Oath. AZH; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 06/01/2022; Received: 06/01/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Mullen, R. - filed by Class Action LLC; Filed: 12/28/2021; Received: 12/28/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Mullen, R. - filed by Class Action LLC; Filed: 12/28/2021; Received: 12/28/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Mullen, R. - filed by Class Action LLC; Filed: 12/28/2021; Received: 12/28/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Mullen, R. - filed by Class Action LLC; Filed: 12/28/2021; Received: 12/28/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Mullen, R. - filed by Class Action LLC; Filed: 12/20/2021; Received: 12/20/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Mullen, R. - filed by Class Action LLC; Filed: 12/20/2021; Received: 12/20/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Closing USA; Filed: 12/03/2021; Received: 12/03/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Closing USA; Filed: 12/03/2021; Received: 12/03/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Closing USA; Filed: 12/03/2021; Received: 12/03/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS & COMPLAINT W/PROOF OF SVC OF HARDSHIP DECL. & AFF. STATING NO RECEIPT OF HARDSHIP DECL.; Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Closing USA; Filed: 12/03/2021; Received: 12/03/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less