This case was last updated from Broome County Courts on 05/13/2020 at 21:36:44 (UTC).

M&T BANK - v. - RICHARD A. DENO et al

Case Summary

On 10/04/2018 M T BANK filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against RICHARD A DENO. This case was filed in Broome County Courts, Supreme Court located in Orange, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Joseph F Cawley. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2610

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Broome, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Joseph F Cawley

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

M&T BANK

Defendants

DOE JOHN SUBSTITUTED OUT BY ORDER

DENO NANCY ADDED IN PLACE OF JOHN DOE BY ORDER

Richard A. Deno

John Doe (Said name being fictitious to represent unknown Tenants/Occupants of the subject property and any other party or entity of any kind, if any, having or claiming an interest or lien upon the mortgaged property.)

(SAID NAME BEING FICTITIOUS TO REPRESENT UNKNOWN TENANTS/OCCUPANTS OF THE SUBJEC

NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION & FINANCE

Not Yet Classified

STERN & EISENBERG, PC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified and Plaintiff Attorneys

WEISBLATT, STACEY ALLYSON

CASCINO, MARGARET JAFFE

BALTCH, TODD RYAN

SCALI, ANTHONY PAUL

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE

JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/16/2020; Received: 03/16/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion #2) Attorney fee affirmation

EXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion #2) Attorney fee affirmation; Filed By: Weisblatt, S.; Filed: 09/20/2019; Received: 09/20/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #2) REFEREE'S OATH AND REPORT AND AMOUNT DUE Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #2) REFEREE'S OATH AND REPORT AND AMOUNT DUE Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Weisblatt, S.; Filed: 09/20/2019; Received: 09/20/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion #2) ORDER OF REFERENCE

EXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion #2) ORDER OF REFERENCE; Filed By: Weisblatt, S.; Filed: 09/20/2019; Received: 09/20/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #2) CPLR 3215 Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #2) CPLR 3215 Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Weisblatt, S.; Filed: 09/20/2019; Received: 09/20/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #2) Affidavits of Service Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #2) Affidavits of Service Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Weisblatt, S.; Filed: 09/20/2019; Received: 09/20/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #2) NOTICE OF Pendency Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #2) NOTICE OF Pendency Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Weisblatt, S.; Filed: 09/20/2019; Received: 09/20/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #2) SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #2) SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; Filed By: Weisblatt, S.; Filed: 09/20/2019; Received: 09/20/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #2) SCRA AND PACER RESULTS Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #2) SCRA AND PACER RESULTS Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Weisblatt, S.; Filed: 09/20/2019; Received: 09/20/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RICHARD A. DENO - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RICHARD A. DENO - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Weisblatt, S. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 10/18/2018; Received: 10/18/2018

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F); Filed By: Baltch, T.; Filed: 10/17/2018; Received: 10/17/2018

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A); Filed By: Baltch, T.; Filed: 10/17/2018; Received: 10/17/2018

RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed By: Baltch, T.; Filed: 10/17/2018; Received: 10/17/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR FILING; Filed By: Weisblatt, S. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 10/15/2018; Received: 10/15/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Weisblatt, S. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 10/15/2018; Received: 10/15/2018

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Baltch, T.; Filed: 10/04/2018; Received: 10/04/2018

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Baltch, T.; Filed: 10/04/2018; Received: 10/04/2018

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Baltch, T.; Filed: 10/04/2018; Received: 10/04/2018

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/16/2020; Received: 03/16/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion #2) Attorney fee affirmation; Filed By: Weisblatt, S.; Filed: 09/20/2019; Received: 09/20/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #2) REFEREE'S OATH AND REPORT AND AMOUNT DUE Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Weisblatt, S.; Filed: 09/20/2019; Received: 09/20/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion #2) ORDER OF REFERENCE; Filed By: Weisblatt, S.; Filed: 09/20/2019; Received: 09/20/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #2) CPLR 3215 Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Weisblatt, S.; Filed: 09/20/2019; Received: 09/20/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #2) Affidavits of Service Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Weisblatt, S.; Filed: 09/20/2019; Received: 09/20/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #2) NOTICE OF Pendency Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Weisblatt, S.; Filed: 09/20/2019; Received: 09/20/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #2) SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; Filed By: Weisblatt, S.; Filed: 09/20/2019; Received: 09/20/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #2) SCRA AND PACER RESULTS Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Weisblatt, S.; Filed: 09/20/2019; Received: 09/20/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #2) 90 DAY NOTICE Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Weisblatt, S.; Filed: 09/20/2019; Received: 09/20/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT RICHARD A. DENO - 3215 AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE; Filed By: Weisblatt, S. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 10/18/2018; Received: 10/18/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RICHARD A. DENO - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Weisblatt, S. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 10/18/2018; Received: 10/18/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F); Filed By: Baltch, T.; Filed: 10/17/2018; Received: 10/17/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A); Filed By: Baltch, T.; Filed: 10/17/2018; Received: 10/17/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed By: Baltch, T.; Filed: 10/17/2018; Received: 10/17/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR FILING; Filed By: Weisblatt, S. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 10/15/2018; Received: 10/15/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Weisblatt, S. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 10/15/2018; Received: 10/15/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Baltch, T.; Filed: 10/04/2018; Received: 10/04/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Baltch, T.; Filed: 10/04/2018; Received: 10/04/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Baltch, T.; Filed: 10/04/2018; Received: 10/04/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less