This case was last updated from Cortland County Courts on 02/08/2020 at 16:05:41 (UTC).

M&T BANK, - v. - PRO TECH AUTO GLASS INC et al

Case Summary

On 05/02/2017 M T BANK filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against PRO TECH AUTO GLASS INC. This case was filed in Cortland County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****-418

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Cortland, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

M&T BANK,

Defendants

STATOIL USA ONSHORE PROPERTIES INC.

NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE

PRO TECH AUTO GLASS INC

JOHN DOE #1- #50 and MARY ROE #1- #50, the last two names being fictitious, it being intended to name all other parties who may have some interest in or lien upon the premises described in the complaint,

Kenneth J. Parrish

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RUUSKA, RYAN E

Attorney at SCHILLER, KNAPP, LEFKOWITZ & HERTZEL, LLP

 

Court Documents

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT LETTER FROM COUNTY CLERK

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT LETTER FROM COUNTY CLERK; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/13/2018; Received: 04/12/2018

REFEREE REPORT OF SALE

REFEREE REPORT OF SALE; Filed By: Ruuska, R.; Filed: 03/06/2018; Received: 03/06/2018

FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM

FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM; Filed By: Ruuska, R.; Filed: 03/06/2018; Received: 03/06/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - A Affidavit of Posting

EXHIBIT(S) - A Affidavit of Posting; Filed By: Ruuska, R.; Filed: 02/05/2018; Received: 02/05/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service by mail

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service by mail; Filed By: Ruuska, R.; Filed: 01/19/2018; Received: 01/19/2018

NOTICE OF SALE Notice of Sale

NOTICE OF SALE Notice of Sale; Filed By: Ruuska, R.; Filed: 01/19/2018; Received: 01/19/2018

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #2) Notice of Entry

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #2) Notice of Entry; Filed By: Ruuska, R.; Filed: 01/03/2018; Received: 01/03/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2) Affidavit of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Ruuska, R.; Filed: 01/03/2018; Received: 01/03/2018

JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE

JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/15/2017; Received: 12/15/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/ DAVID KEENER AS JOHN DOE #1

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/ DAVID KEENER AS JOHN DOE #1; Filed By: Ruuska, R. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 05/22/2017; Received: 05/22/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/ ESTER PARRISH AS MARY ROE #1

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/ ESTER PARRISH AS MARY ROE #1; Filed By: Ruuska, R. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 05/22/2017; Received: 05/22/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/ NYS DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/ NYS DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE; Filed By: Ruuska, R. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 05/19/2017; Received: 05/19/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM; Filed By: Ruuska, R. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 05/12/2017; Received: 05/12/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/ STATOIL USA ONSHORE PROPERTIES INC

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/ STATOIL USA ONSHORE PROPERTIES INC; Filed By: Ruuska, R. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 05/12/2017; Received: 05/12/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/ PRO TECH AUTO GLASS INC

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/ PRO TECH AUTO GLASS INC; Filed By: Ruuska, R. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 05/12/2017; Received: 05/12/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Ruuska, R.; Filed: 05/02/2017; Received: 05/02/2017

COMPLAINT Verified Complaint

COMPLAINT Verified Complaint; Filed By: Ruuska, R.; Filed: 05/02/2017; Received: 05/02/2017

SUMMONS

SUMMONS; Filed By: Ruuska, R.; Filed: 05/02/2017; Received: 05/02/2017

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT LETTER FROM COUNTY CLERK; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/13/2018; Received: 04/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREFEREE REPORT OF SALE; Filed By: Ruuska, R.; Filed: 03/06/2018; Received: 03/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM; Filed By: Ruuska, R.; Filed: 03/06/2018; Received: 03/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Affidavit of Posting; Filed By: Ruuska, R.; Filed: 02/05/2018; Received: 02/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service by mail; Filed By: Ruuska, R.; Filed: 01/19/2018; Received: 01/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SALE Notice of Sale; Filed By: Ruuska, R.; Filed: 01/19/2018; Received: 01/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #2) Notice of Entry; Filed By: Ruuska, R.; Filed: 01/03/2018; Received: 01/03/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Ruuska, R.; Filed: 01/03/2018; Received: 01/03/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/15/2017; Received: 12/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • DocketJUDGMENT - SIGNED BY COURT TO COUNTY CLERK (Motion #2); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/15/2017; Received: 12/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 05/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/ DAVID KEENER AS JOHN DOE #1; Filed By: Ruuska, R. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 05/22/2017; Received: 05/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/ DAVID KEENER AS JOHN DOE #1; Filed By: Ruuska, R. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 05/22/2017; Received: 05/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/ ESTER PARRISH AS MARY ROE #1; Filed By: Ruuska, R. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 05/22/2017; Received: 05/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/ NYS DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE; Filed By: Ruuska, R. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 05/19/2017; Received: 05/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM; Filed By: Ruuska, R. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 05/12/2017; Received: 05/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/ STATOIL USA ONSHORE PROPERTIES INC; Filed By: Ruuska, R. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 05/12/2017; Received: 05/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/ PRO TECH AUTO GLASS INC; Filed By: Ruuska, R. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 05/12/2017; Received: 05/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Ruuska, R.; Filed: 05/02/2017; Received: 05/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT Verified Complaint; Filed By: Ruuska, R.; Filed: 05/02/2017; Received: 05/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS; Filed By: Ruuska, R.; Filed: 05/02/2017; Received: 05/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less