This case was last updated from Livingston County Courts on 02/21/2020 at 19:17:40 (UTC).

M&T BANK v. PAMELA CURTIS et al

Case Summary

On 01/25/2019 M T BANK filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against PAMELA CURTIS. This case was filed in Livingston County Courts, Supreme Court located in Orange, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Livingston, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

M&T BANK

Defendants

JOHN DOE #1- #50 and MARY ROE #1- #50 the last two names being fictitious, it being intended to name all other parties who may have some interest in or lien upon the premises described in the complaint

Pamela Curtis

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JOHNSON, HEATHER ANN

MCGINN, MATTHEW BRIAN

RUUSKA, RYAN E

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Ruuska, R.; Filed: 01/25/2019; Received: 01/25/2019

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Ruuska, R.; Filed: 01/25/2019; Received: 01/25/2019

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Ruuska, R.; Filed: 01/25/2019; Received: 01/25/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE TAVIAN 1303 AOM

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE TAVIAN 1303 AOM; Filed By: Mcginn, M. - filed by STOX Pro Serve; Filed: 02/18/2019; Received: 02/18/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Mcginn, M. - filed by STOX Pro Serve; Filed: 02/18/2019; Received: 02/18/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE pamela curtis 3215 aom

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE pamela curtis 3215 aom; Filed By: Mcginn, M. - filed by STOX Pro Serve; Filed: 02/18/2019; Received: 02/18/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PAMELA CURTIS AOS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PAMELA CURTIS AOS; Filed By: Mcginn, M. - filed by STOX Pro Serve; Filed: 02/18/2019; Received: 02/18/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NO ADDTL DOES

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NO ADDTL DOES; Filed By: Mcginn, M. - filed by STOX Pro Serve; Filed: 02/18/2019; Received: 02/18/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE TAVIAN HINO AOS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE TAVIAN HINO AOS; Filed By: Mcginn, M. - filed by STOX Pro Serve; Filed: 02/18/2019; Received: 02/18/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Johnson, H.; Filed: 02/26/2019; Received: 02/26/2019

RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed By: Johnson, H.; Filed: 02/26/2019; Received: 02/26/2019

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F); Filed By: Johnson, H.; Filed: 02/26/2019; Received: 02/26/2019

ORDER - RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE Order and Letter

ORDER - RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE Order and Letter; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/05/2019; Received: 03/05/2019

ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE -REQUEST

ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE -REQUEST; Filed By: Ruuska, R.; Filed: 08/22/2019; Received: 08/22/2019

NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Johnson, H.; Filed: 09/06/2019; Received: 09/06/2019

CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS

CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS; Filed By: Johnson, H.; Filed: 09/06/2019; Received: 09/06/2019

AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Johnson, H.; Filed: 09/06/2019; Received: 09/06/2019

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION; Filed By: Johnson, H.; Filed: 09/06/2019; Received: 09/06/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS; Filed By: Johnson, H.; Filed: 09/06/2019; Received: 09/06/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Johnson, H.; Filed: 09/06/2019; Received: 09/06/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE -REQUEST; Filed By: Ruuska, R.; Filed: 08/22/2019; Received: 08/22/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE Order and Letter; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/05/2019; Received: 03/05/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F); Filed By: Johnson, H.; Filed: 02/26/2019; Received: 02/26/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed By: Johnson, H.; Filed: 02/26/2019; Received: 02/26/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Johnson, H.; Filed: 02/26/2019; Received: 02/26/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE TAVIAN HINO AOS; Filed By: Mcginn, M. - filed by STOX Pro Serve; Filed: 02/18/2019; Received: 02/18/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NO ADDTL DOES; Filed By: Mcginn, M. - filed by STOX Pro Serve; Filed: 02/18/2019; Received: 02/18/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PAMELA CURTIS AOS; Filed By: Mcginn, M. - filed by STOX Pro Serve; Filed: 02/18/2019; Received: 02/18/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE pamela curtis 3215 aom; Filed By: Mcginn, M. - filed by STOX Pro Serve; Filed: 02/18/2019; Received: 02/18/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Mcginn, M. - filed by STOX Pro Serve; Filed: 02/18/2019; Received: 02/18/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE TAVIAN 1303 AOM; Filed By: Mcginn, M. - filed by STOX Pro Serve; Filed: 02/18/2019; Received: 02/18/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Ruuska, R.; Filed: 01/25/2019; Received: 01/25/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Ruuska, R.; Filed: 01/25/2019; Received: 01/25/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Ruuska, R.; Filed: 01/25/2019; Received: 01/25/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RUUSKA, RYAN E

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JOHNSON, HEATHER ANN