This case was last updated from Oneida County Courts on 02/12/2020 at 09:21:50 (UTC).

M&T BANK v. LAURA SHIVAS AKA et al

Case Summary

On 01/13/2020 M T BANK filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against LAURA SHIVAS AKA. This case was filed in Oneida County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********0139

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Oneida County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Oneida, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

M&T BANK

Defendants

Laura L Furney aka

Robert Shivas aka

JOHN DOE

Laura L Hartzog

Laura L Shivas aka

Laura Shivas aka

Robert C Shivas II

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GRIGG, NATALIE ANN

Attorney at Woods Oviatt Gilman, LLP

MULLEN, RICHARD S

Attorney at Woods Oviatt Gilman LLP

 

Court Documents

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F); Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE Filed by CXB - 20192756

RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE Filed by CXB - 20192756; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Mullen, R. - filed by Class Action LLC; Filed: 01/24/2020; Received: 01/24/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Mullen, R. - filed by Class Action LLC; Filed: 01/24/2020; Received: 01/24/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Mullen, R. - filed by Class Action LLC; Filed: 01/24/2020; Received: 01/24/2020

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Mullen, R. - filed by Class Action LLC; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Mullen, R. - filed by Class Action LLC; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Mullen, R. - filed by Class Action LLC; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Mullen, R. - filed by Class Action LLC; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Frontier Abstract; Filed: 01/13/2020; Received: 01/13/2020

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Frontier Abstract; Filed: 01/13/2020; Received: 01/13/2020

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Frontier Abstract; Filed: 01/13/2020; Received: 01/13/2020

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Frontier Abstract; Filed: 01/13/2020; Received: 01/13/2020

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F); Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE Filed by CXB - 20192756; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Mullen, R. - filed by Class Action LLC; Filed: 01/24/2020; Received: 01/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Mullen, R. - filed by Class Action LLC; Filed: 01/24/2020; Received: 01/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Mullen, R. - filed by Class Action LLC; Filed: 01/24/2020; Received: 01/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Mullen, R. - filed by Class Action LLC; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Mullen, R. - filed by Class Action LLC; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Mullen, R. - filed by Class Action LLC; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Mullen, R. - filed by Class Action LLC; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Frontier Abstract; Filed: 01/13/2020; Received: 01/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Frontier Abstract; Filed: 01/13/2020; Received: 01/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Frontier Abstract; Filed: 01/13/2020; Received: 01/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Frontier Abstract; Filed: 01/13/2020; Received: 01/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less