This case was last updated from Broome County Courts on 07/10/2022 at 10:26:42 (UTC).

M&T Bank v. Kenneth J. Slicklen et al

Case Summary

On 05/12/2022 M T Bank filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Kenneth J Slicklen. This case was filed in Broome County Courts, Supreme Court located in Orange, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Joseph F Cawley. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0927

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Broome, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Joseph F Cawley

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

M&T Bank

Defendants

Kenneth J. Slicklen

John Doe #1 through #6, and Jane Doe #1 through #6, the last twelve names being fictitious, it being the intention of Plaintiff to designate any and all occupants, tenants, persons or corporations, if any, having or claiming an interest in or lien up

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZAMAN, RIMA

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Zaman, R. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 05/12/2022; Received: 05/12/2022

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Zaman, R. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 05/12/2022; Received: 05/12/2022

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Zaman, R. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 05/12/2022; Received: 05/12/2022

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Zaman, R. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 05/12/2022; Received: 05/12/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE KENNETH J. SLICKLEN

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE KENNETH J. SLICKLEN; Filed By: Zaman, R. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 06/24/2022; Received: 06/24/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE KENNETH J. SLICKLEN 3215

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE KENNETH J. SLICKLEN 3215; Filed By: Zaman, R. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 06/24/2022; Received: 06/24/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE EDWARD ARNOLD SHA JOHN DOE #1

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE EDWARD ARNOLD SHA JOHN DOE #1; Filed By: Zaman, R. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 06/24/2022; Received: 06/24/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE EDWARD ARNOLD SHA JOHN DOE #1 MAILING

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE EDWARD ARNOLD SHA JOHN DOE #1 MAILING; Filed By: Zaman, R. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 06/24/2022; Received: 06/24/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CHRISTOPHER ARNOLD SHA JOHN DOE #2

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CHRISTOPHER ARNOLD SHA JOHN DOE #2; Filed By: Zaman, R. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 06/24/2022; Received: 06/24/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CHRISTOPHER ARNOLD SHA JOHN DOE #2 MAILING

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CHRISTOPHER ARNOLD SHA JOHN DOE #2 MAILING; Filed By: Zaman, R. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 06/24/2022; Received: 06/24/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OCCUPANT MAILING

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OCCUPANT MAILING; Filed By: Zaman, R. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 06/24/2022; Received: 06/24/2022

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Zaman, R. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 06/24/2022; Received: 06/24/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE KENNETH J. SLICKLEN- RJI MAILING

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE KENNETH J. SLICKLEN- RJI MAILING; Filed By: Zaman, R. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 07/06/2022; Received: 07/06/2022

RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCRJI

RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCRJI; Filed By: Zaman, R. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 07/06/2022; Received: 07/06/2022

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F); Filed By: Zaman, R. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 07/06/2022; Received: 07/06/2022

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT JUDICIAL ASSIGNMNMENT NOTICE

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT JUDICIAL ASSIGNMNMENT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/08/2022; Received: 07/08/2022

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (2)

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (2); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/08/2022; Received: 07/08/2022

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (2); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/08/2022; Received: 07/08/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT JUDICIAL ASSIGNMNMENT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/08/2022; Received: 07/08/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F); Filed By: Zaman, R. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 07/06/2022; Received: 07/06/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCRJI; Filed By: Zaman, R. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 07/06/2022; Received: 07/06/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE KENNETH J. SLICKLEN- RJI MAILING; Filed By: Zaman, R. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 07/06/2022; Received: 07/06/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Zaman, R. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 06/24/2022; Received: 06/24/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OCCUPANT MAILING; Filed By: Zaman, R. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 06/24/2022; Received: 06/24/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CHRISTOPHER ARNOLD SHA JOHN DOE #2 MAILING; Filed By: Zaman, R. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 06/24/2022; Received: 06/24/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CHRISTOPHER ARNOLD SHA JOHN DOE #2; Filed By: Zaman, R. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 06/24/2022; Received: 06/24/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE EDWARD ARNOLD SHA JOHN DOE #1 MAILING; Filed By: Zaman, R. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 06/24/2022; Received: 06/24/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE EDWARD ARNOLD SHA JOHN DOE #1; Filed By: Zaman, R. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 06/24/2022; Received: 06/24/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE KENNETH J. SLICKLEN 3215; Filed By: Zaman, R. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 06/24/2022; Received: 06/24/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE KENNETH J. SLICKLEN; Filed By: Zaman, R. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 06/24/2022; Received: 06/24/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Zaman, R. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 05/12/2022; Received: 05/12/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Zaman, R. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 05/12/2022; Received: 05/12/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Zaman, R. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 05/12/2022; Received: 05/12/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Zaman, R. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 05/12/2022; Received: 05/12/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less