This case was last updated from Westchester County Courts on 02/25/2020 at 12:26:42 (UTC).

M&T BANK v. KAREN A. BARRETT et al

Case Summary

On 03/27/2019 M T BANK filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against KAREN A BARRETT. This case was filed in Westchester County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2019

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Westchester County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Westchester, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

M&T BANK

Defendants

JOHN DOE #1- #50 and MARY ROE #1- #50, the last two names being fictitious, it being intended to name all other parties who may have some interest in or lien upon the premises described in the complaint

SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT

Karen D. Brown

JCL CAPITAL PARTNERS I, L.P.

Karen A. Barrett

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

RUUSKA, RYAN E

Attorney at SCHILLER, KNAPP, LEFKOWITZ & HERTZEL, LLP

JOHNSON, HEATHER ANN

Attorney at Mandarich Law Group

LEFKOWITZ, GARY ALAN

Attorney at SCHILLER, KNAPP, LEFKOWITZ & HERTZEL, LLP

MCGINN, MATTHEW BRIAN

Attorney at SCHILLER, KNAPP, LEFKOWITZ & HERTZEL, LLC

SANDA, GREGORY JAMES

Attorney at Schiller, Knapp, Lefkowitz & Hertzel, LLP

Defendant Attorneys

GURA, JOHN E.

Attorney at UNITED STATES ATTORNEY'S OFFICE- S.D.N.Y.

PERSON, CARL E.

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #1)

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Person, C.; Filed: 02/12/2020; Received: 02/12/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1)

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1); Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1) Affidavit in Support

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1) Affidavit in Support; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1) Attorney Affirmation

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1) Attorney Affirmation; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) Affirmation in Compliance with Rule 3408

AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) Affirmation in Compliance with Rule 3408; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

COURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - MAP

COURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - MAP; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/12/2019; Received: 12/12/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/11/2019; Received: 12/11/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SECRETARY OF HOUSING & URBAN DELVPT(DOCUMENTS TO O. GORDON THE CLERK)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SECRETARY OF HOUSING & URBAN DELVPT(DOCUMENTS TO O. GORDON THE CLERK); Filed By: Mcginn, M. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 04/12/2019; Received: 04/12/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA INTERNAL

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA INTERNAL; Filed By: Mcginn, M. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 04/12/2019; Received: 04/12/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SECRETARY OF HOUSING & URBAN DEVPT

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SECRETARY OF HOUSING & URBAN DEVPT; Filed By: Mcginn, M. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 04/12/2019; Received: 04/12/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Mcginn, M. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 04/12/2019; Received: 04/12/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SECRETARY OF HOUSING & URBAN DELVPT(NEW YORK)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SECRETARY OF HOUSING & URBAN DELVPT(NEW YORK); Filed By: Mcginn, M. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 04/12/2019; Received: 04/12/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SECRETARY OF HOUSING & URBAN DEVLPT(WASHINGTON DC)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SECRETARY OF HOUSING & URBAN DEVLPT(WASHINGTON DC); Filed By: Mcginn, M. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 04/12/2019; Received: 04/12/2019

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Ruuska, R.; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Ruuska, R.; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Ruuska, R.; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Person, C.; Filed: 02/12/2020; Received: 02/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1); Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1) Affidavit in Support; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1) Attorney Affirmation; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #1) Affirmation in Compliance with Rule 3408; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - MAP; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/12/2019; Received: 12/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/11/2019; Received: 12/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/11/2019; Received: 12/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OCCUPANT(1303); Filed By: Mcginn, M. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 04/19/2019; Received: 04/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SECRETARY OF HOUSING & URBAN DELVPT(DOCUMENTS TO O. GORDON THE CLERK); Filed By: Mcginn, M. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 04/12/2019; Received: 04/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA INTERNAL; Filed By: Mcginn, M. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 04/12/2019; Received: 04/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SECRETARY OF HOUSING & URBAN DEVPT; Filed By: Mcginn, M. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 04/12/2019; Received: 04/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Mcginn, M. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 04/12/2019; Received: 04/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SECRETARY OF HOUSING & URBAN DELVPT(NEW YORK); Filed By: Mcginn, M. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 04/12/2019; Received: 04/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SECRETARY OF HOUSING & URBAN DEVLPT(WASHINGTON DC); Filed By: Mcginn, M. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 04/12/2019; Received: 04/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Ruuska, R.; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Ruuska, R.; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Ruuska, R.; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less