This case was last updated from Erie County Courts on 02/20/2020 at 18:52:17 (UTC).

M&T BANK v. JENNIFER G. FLANNERY et al

Case Summary

On 01/09/2019 M T BANK filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against JENNIFER G FLANNERY. This case was filed in Erie County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Erie, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

M&T BANK

Defendants

Andrew Huff

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA O/B/O INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE

NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE

Lori ann Shorter

Jennifer G. Flannery ERIE COUNTY PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR, AS ADMINISTRATOR OF THE ESTATE OF BARBARA A. SHAW, DECEASED

Louise Thompson

Donald Huff

Donald Shaw

Brenda Jackson

Sandra Bogan

Jessie Shields

Michael Lottier

JOHN DOE #1- #50 and MARY ROE #1- #50, the last two names being fictitious, it being intended to name all other parties who may have some interest in or lien upon the premises described in the complaint

Betty Bogan

Carl Bogan

GRABBER & SONS LANDSCAPING AND NURSERY, INC

Alexis Bogan

John Bankston

John Shaw III

2 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MCGINN, MATTHEW BRIAN

Attorney at SCHILLER, KNAPP, LEFKOWITZ & HERTZEL, LLC

FRARY, BRENT ALAN

Attorney at Schiller, Knapp, Lefkowitz & Hertzel, LLP

BARRINGER, JASON DENNIS

Attorney at Schiller, Knapp, Lefkowitz & Herzel, LL

 

Court Documents

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F); Filed By: Barringer, J.; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION

RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION; Filed By: Barringer, J.; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - F Amended pleadings

EXHIBIT(S) - F Amended pleadings; Filed By: Barringer, J.; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - E Affidavit of Service

EXHIBIT(S) - E Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Barringer, J.; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - D Notice of Pendency

EXHIBIT(S) - D Notice of Pendency; Filed By: Barringer, J.; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - C summons and complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - C summons and complaint; Filed By: Barringer, J.; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - B Mortgage

EXHIBIT(S) - B Mortgage; Filed By: Barringer, J.; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - A Note

EXHIBIT(S) - A Note; Filed By: Barringer, J.; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Affirmation in support of application to appoint a substitute guardian ad litem

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Affirmation in support of application to appoint a substitute guardian ad litem; Filed By: Barringer, J.; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE USA IRS AOS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE USA IRS AOS; Filed By: Mcginn, M. - filed by STOX Pro Serve; Filed: 02/06/2019; Received: 02/06/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ERIE COUNTY PUBLIC ADMIN

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ERIE COUNTY PUBLIC ADMIN; Filed By: Mcginn, M. - filed by STOX Pro Serve; Filed: 02/06/2019; Received: 02/06/2019

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Supplemental Certificate of Merit

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Supplemental Certificate of Merit; Filed By: Frary, B.; Filed: 01/28/2019; Received: 01/28/2019

NOTICE OF PENDENCY (AMENDED)

NOTICE OF PENDENCY (AMENDED); Filed By: Frary, B.; Filed: 01/28/2019; Received: 01/28/2019

COMPLAINT (AMENDED)

COMPLAINT (AMENDED); Filed By: Frary, B.; Filed: 01/28/2019; Received: 01/28/2019

SUMMONS - SUPPLEMENTAL (PRE RJI)

SUMMONS - SUPPLEMENTAL (PRE RJI); Filed By: Frary, B.; Filed: 01/28/2019; Received: 01/28/2019

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Frary, B.; Filed: 01/09/2019; Received: 01/09/2019

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Frary, B.; Filed: 01/09/2019; Received: 01/09/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Frary, B.; Filed: 01/09/2019; Received: 01/09/2019

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F); Filed By: Barringer, J.; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION; Filed By: Barringer, J.; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F Amended pleadings; Filed By: Barringer, J.; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Barringer, J.; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D Notice of Pendency; Filed By: Barringer, J.; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C summons and complaint; Filed By: Barringer, J.; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Mortgage; Filed By: Barringer, J.; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Note; Filed By: Barringer, J.; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Affirmation in support of application to appoint a substitute guardian ad litem; Filed By: Barringer, J.; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) Order granting leave to amend; Filed By: Barringer, J.; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE GRABBER & SONS AOS; Filed By: Mcginn, M. - filed by STOX Pro Serve; Filed: 02/06/2019; Received: 02/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE USA IRS AOS; Filed By: Mcginn, M. - filed by STOX Pro Serve; Filed: 02/06/2019; Received: 02/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ERIE COUNTY PUBLIC ADMIN; Filed By: Mcginn, M. - filed by STOX Pro Serve; Filed: 02/06/2019; Received: 02/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT Supplemental Certificate of Merit; Filed By: Frary, B.; Filed: 01/28/2019; Received: 01/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY (AMENDED); Filed By: Frary, B.; Filed: 01/28/2019; Received: 01/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT (AMENDED); Filed By: Frary, B.; Filed: 01/28/2019; Received: 01/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS - SUPPLEMENTAL (PRE RJI); Filed By: Frary, B.; Filed: 01/28/2019; Received: 01/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Frary, B.; Filed: 01/09/2019; Received: 01/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Frary, B.; Filed: 01/09/2019; Received: 01/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Frary, B.; Filed: 01/09/2019; Received: 01/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less