This case was last updated from Broome County Courts on 09/15/2022 at 02:08:54 (UTC).

M&T BANK v. JAMES WILLIAMS, AS HEIR TO THE ESTATE OF PATRICK J. WILLIAMS et al

Case Summary

On 01/03/2022 M T BANK filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against JAMES WILLIAMS, AS HEIR TO THE ESTATE OF PATRICK J WILLIAMS. This case was filed in Broome County Courts, Supreme Court located in Orange, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Joseph F Cawley. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0003

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Broome, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Joseph F Cawley

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

M&T BANK

ALL UNKNOWN HEIRS, DEVISEES AND PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVES OF PATRICK J. WILLIAMS

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA O/B/O INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE

NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE

PALISADES COLLECTION LLC

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBA in New York as MIDLAND FUNDING OF DELAWARE LLC

WILLIAMS PATRICK J ESTATE OF/HEIRS

Nancy-heir Williams

JOHN DOE #1-#50 AND MARY ROE #1-#50, THE LAST TWO NAMES BEING FICTITIOUS, IT BEI

ESTATE OF PATRICK J WILLIAMS/HEIRS

James-heir Williams

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FRARY, BRENT ALAN

BARRINGER, JASON DENNIS

Defendant Attorneys

HANLEY, ANTHONY

SPINA, THOMAS

 

Court Documents

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT JUDICIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT JUDICIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/14/2022; Received: 09/14/2022

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) (Motion #1)

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) (Motion #1); Filed By: Barringer, J. - filed by Schiller, Knapp, Lefkowitz & Hertzel LLP; Filed: 09/13/2022; Received: 09/13/2022

RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1)

RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1); Filed By: Barringer, J. - filed by Schiller, Knapp, Lefkowitz & Hertzel LLP; Filed: 09/13/2022; Received: 09/13/2022

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1)

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1); Filed By: Barringer, J. - filed by Schiller, Knapp, Lefkowitz & Hertzel LLP; Filed: 09/13/2022; Received: 09/13/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Service Affidavits

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Service Affidavits; Filed By: Barringer, J. - filed by Schiller, Knapp, Lefkowitz & Hertzel LLP; Filed: 09/13/2022; Received: 09/13/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Affidavit of Due Diligence Possible SSN Administratively Redacted

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Affidavit of Due Diligence Possible SSN Administratively Redacted; Filed By: Barringer, J. - filed by Schiller, Knapp, Lefkowitz & Hertzel LLP; Filed: 09/13/2022; Received: 09/13/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Death Certificate

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Death Certificate; Filed By: Barringer, J. - filed by Schiller, Knapp, Lefkowitz & Hertzel LLP; Filed: 09/13/2022; Received: 09/13/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Notice of Pendency

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Notice of Pendency; Filed By: Barringer, J. - filed by Schiller, Knapp, Lefkowitz & Hertzel LLP; Filed: 09/13/2022; Received: 09/13/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons and Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Barringer, J. - filed by Schiller, Knapp, Lefkowitz & Hertzel LLP; Filed: 09/13/2022; Received: 09/13/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE; Filed By: Barringer, J. - filed by The STOX Group; Filed: 01/21/2022; Received: 01/21/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC; Filed By: Barringer, J. - filed by The STOX Group; Filed: 01/21/2022; Received: 01/21/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PALISADES COLLECTION LLC

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PALISADES COLLECTION LLC; Filed By: Barringer, J. - filed by The STOX Group; Filed: 01/21/2022; Received: 01/21/2022

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Frary, B. - filed by Schiller, Knapp, Lefkowitz & Hertzel LLP; Filed: 01/03/2022; Received: 01/03/2022

NOTICE TO DEFENDANT (PER AO-131-20)

NOTICE TO DEFENDANT (PER AO-131-20); Filed By: Frary, B. - filed by Schiller, Knapp, Lefkowitz & Hertzel LLP; Filed: 01/03/2022; Received: 01/03/2022

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Frary, B. - filed by Schiller, Knapp, Lefkowitz & Hertzel LLP; Filed: 01/03/2022; Received: 01/03/2022

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Frary, B. - filed by Schiller, Knapp, Lefkowitz & Hertzel LLP; Filed: 01/03/2022; Received: 01/03/2022

AFFIRMATION Hardship Declaration Affirmation- No Receipt

AFFIRMATION Hardship Declaration Affirmation- No Receipt; Filed By: Frary, B. - filed by Schiller, Knapp, Lefkowitz & Hertzel LLP; Filed: 01/03/2022; Received: 01/03/2022

SUMMONS & COMPLAINT W/PROOF OF SVC OF HARDSHIP DECL. & AFF. STATING NO RECEIPT OF HARDSHIP DECL.

SUMMONS & COMPLAINT W/PROOF OF SVC OF HARDSHIP DECL. & AFF. STATING NO RECEIPT OF HARDSHIP DECL.; Filed By: Frary, B. - filed by Schiller, Knapp, Lefkowitz & Hertzel LLP; Filed: 01/03/2022; Received: 01/03/2022

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT JUDICIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/14/2022; Received: 09/14/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) (Motion #1); Filed By: Barringer, J. - filed by Schiller, Knapp, Lefkowitz & Hertzel LLP; Filed: 09/13/2022; Received: 09/13/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1); Filed By: Barringer, J. - filed by Schiller, Knapp, Lefkowitz & Hertzel LLP; Filed: 09/13/2022; Received: 09/13/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1); Filed By: Barringer, J. - filed by Schiller, Knapp, Lefkowitz & Hertzel LLP; Filed: 09/13/2022; Received: 09/13/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Service Affidavits; Filed By: Barringer, J. - filed by Schiller, Knapp, Lefkowitz & Hertzel LLP; Filed: 09/13/2022; Received: 09/13/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Affidavit of Due Diligence Possible SSN Administratively Redacted; Filed By: Barringer, J. - filed by Schiller, Knapp, Lefkowitz & Hertzel LLP; Filed: 09/13/2022; Received: 09/13/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Death Certificate; Filed By: Barringer, J. - filed by Schiller, Knapp, Lefkowitz & Hertzel LLP; Filed: 09/13/2022; Received: 09/13/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Notice of Pendency; Filed By: Barringer, J. - filed by Schiller, Knapp, Lefkowitz & Hertzel LLP; Filed: 09/13/2022; Received: 09/13/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Barringer, J. - filed by Schiller, Knapp, Lefkowitz & Hertzel LLP; Filed: 09/13/2022; Received: 09/13/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #1); Filed By: Barringer, J. - filed by Schiller, Knapp, Lefkowitz & Hertzel LLP; Filed: 09/13/2022; Received: 09/13/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Barringer, J. - filed by The STOX Group; Filed: 01/21/2022; Received: 01/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE; Filed By: Barringer, J. - filed by The STOX Group; Filed: 01/21/2022; Received: 01/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC; Filed By: Barringer, J. - filed by The STOX Group; Filed: 01/21/2022; Received: 01/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PALISADES COLLECTION LLC; Filed By: Barringer, J. - filed by The STOX Group; Filed: 01/21/2022; Received: 01/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Frary, B. - filed by Schiller, Knapp, Lefkowitz & Hertzel LLP; Filed: 01/03/2022; Received: 01/03/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO DEFENDANT (PER AO-131-20); Filed By: Frary, B. - filed by Schiller, Knapp, Lefkowitz & Hertzel LLP; Filed: 01/03/2022; Received: 01/03/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Frary, B. - filed by Schiller, Knapp, Lefkowitz & Hertzel LLP; Filed: 01/03/2022; Received: 01/03/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Frary, B. - filed by Schiller, Knapp, Lefkowitz & Hertzel LLP; Filed: 01/03/2022; Received: 01/03/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION Hardship Declaration Affirmation- No Receipt; Filed By: Frary, B. - filed by Schiller, Knapp, Lefkowitz & Hertzel LLP; Filed: 01/03/2022; Received: 01/03/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS & COMPLAINT W/PROOF OF SVC OF HARDSHIP DECL. & AFF. STATING NO RECEIPT OF HARDSHIP DECL.; Filed By: Frary, B. - filed by Schiller, Knapp, Lefkowitz & Hertzel LLP; Filed: 01/03/2022; Received: 01/03/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less