This case was last updated from Chautauqua County Courts on 02/27/2020 at 23:34:50 (UTC).

M&T Bank v. Andrew T. Lindberg et al

Case Summary

On 05/09/2019 M T Bank filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Andrew T Lindberg. This case was filed in Chautauqua County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0737

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Chautauqua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Chautauqua, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

M&T Bank

Defendant

Andrew T Lindberg

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CULLY, INGE R.

Attorney at McCalla Raymer Leibert Pierce, LLC

CHRISTIE, MONICA G

Attorney at MCCALLA RAYMER LEIBERT PIERCE, LLC

 

Court Documents

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Homeowner notice 1-15-20. Mailed 1-6-20.

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Homeowner notice 1-15-20. Mailed 1-6-20.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/06/2020; Received: 01/06/2020

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Counsel notice 1-15-20.

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Counsel notice 1-15-20.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/06/2020; Received: 01/06/2020

ORDER - FINAL

ORDER - FINAL; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/03/2020; Received: 01/03/2020

ORDER - APPOINTING REFEREE (Motion #1)

ORDER - APPOINTING REFEREE (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/26/2019; Received: 12/26/2019

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Homeowner notice 12-18-19. Mailed 12-2-19.

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Homeowner notice 12-18-19. Mailed 12-2-19.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/02/2019; Received: 12/02/2019

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Counsel notice 12-18-19.

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Counsel notice 12-18-19.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/02/2019; Received: 12/02/2019

RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1)

RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1); Filed By: Christie, M.; Filed: 11/27/2019; Received: 11/27/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Christie, M.; Filed: 11/27/2019; Received: 11/27/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #1) Affidavit of Merit and Amount Due

EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #1) Affidavit of Merit and Amount Due; Filed By: Christie, M.; Filed: 11/27/2019; Received: 11/27/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Cully, I. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 05/09/2019; Received: 05/09/2019

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Cully, I. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 05/09/2019; Received: 05/09/2019

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Cully, I. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 05/09/2019; Received: 05/09/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - E Exhibit E Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - E Exhibit E Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Cully, I. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 05/09/2019; Received: 05/09/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - D Exhibit D Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - D Exhibit D Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Cully, I. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 05/09/2019; Received: 05/09/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C Exhibit C Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - C Exhibit C Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Cully, I. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 05/09/2019; Received: 05/09/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit B Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit B Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Cully, I. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 05/09/2019; Received: 05/09/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Cully, I. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 05/09/2019; Received: 05/09/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Cully, I. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 05/09/2019; Received: 05/09/2019

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Homeowner notice 1-15-20. Mailed 1-6-20.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/06/2020; Received: 01/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Counsel notice 1-15-20.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/06/2020; Received: 01/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - FINAL; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/03/2020; Received: 01/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - APPOINTING REFEREE (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/26/2019; Received: 12/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Homeowner notice 12-18-19. Mailed 12-2-19.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/02/2019; Received: 12/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Counsel notice 12-18-19.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/02/2019; Received: 12/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) (Motion #1)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1); Filed By: Christie, M.; Filed: 11/27/2019; Received: 11/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Christie, M.; Filed: 11/27/2019; Received: 11/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #1) Affidavit of Merit and Amount Due; Filed By: Christie, M.; Filed: 11/27/2019; Received: 11/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ANDREW T. LINDBERG; Filed By: Cully, I. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 05/31/2019; Received: 05/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Cully, I. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 05/09/2019; Received: 05/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Cully, I. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 05/09/2019; Received: 05/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Cully, I. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 05/09/2019; Received: 05/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E Exhibit E Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Cully, I. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 05/09/2019; Received: 05/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D Exhibit D Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Cully, I. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 05/09/2019; Received: 05/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Exhibit C Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Cully, I. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 05/09/2019; Received: 05/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit B Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Cully, I. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 05/09/2019; Received: 05/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Cully, I. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 05/09/2019; Received: 05/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Cully, I. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 05/09/2019; Received: 05/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less