This case was last updated from Chautauqua County Courts on 02/29/2020 at 16:44:51 (UTC).

M&T BANK v. AMANDA SENDALL et al

Case Summary

On 06/05/2019 M T BANK filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against AMANDA SENDALL. This case was filed in Chautauqua County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0873

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Chautauqua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Chautauqua, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

M + T BANK

Defendants

Amanda S Sendall

THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK

Amanda Sendall A/K/A AMANDA S. SENDALL A/K/A AMANDA OLSON

Amanda Olson

NEW YORK STATE PEOPLE OF

Not Yet Classified

Frontier Abstract

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified and Plaintiff Attorneys

GRIGG, NATALIE ANN

Attorney at Woods Oviatt Gilman, LLP

MUNIAN, VICTORIA ELIZABETH

Attorney at Woods Oviatt Gilman LLP

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Filed by CXB - 20191425

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Filed by CXB - 20191425; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 12/20/2019; Received: 12/20/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) *Corrected* Filed by CXB - 20191425

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) *Corrected* Filed by CXB - 20191425; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 12/20/2019; Received: 12/20/2019

ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY (Motion #1)

ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/09/2019; Received: 12/09/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - - (Motion #1) Supportng Documents

EXHIBIT(S) - - (Motion #1) Supportng Documents; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 10/10/2019; Received: 10/10/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 10/10/2019; Received: 10/10/2019

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1)

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1); Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 10/10/2019; Received: 10/10/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 10/10/2019; Received: 10/10/2019

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Filed by MXT - 20191425

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Filed by MXT - 20191425; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 10/10/2019; Received: 10/10/2019

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Homeowner notice 10-16-19, mailed 9-9-19.

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Homeowner notice 10-16-19, mailed 9-9-19.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/09/2019; Received: 09/09/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Munian, V. - filed by Class Action LLC; Filed: 06/18/2019; Received: 06/18/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Munian, V. - filed by Class Action LLC; Filed: 06/18/2019; Received: 06/18/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C legal description

EXHIBIT(S) - C legal description; Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Frontier Abstract; Filed: 06/06/2019; Received: 06/06/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B Notes

EXHIBIT(S) - B Notes; Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Frontier Abstract; Filed: 06/06/2019; Received: 06/06/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A defendants list

EXHIBIT(S) - A defendants list; Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Frontier Abstract; Filed: 06/06/2019; Received: 06/06/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING *Corrected*

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING *Corrected*; Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Frontier Abstract; Filed: 06/05/2019; Received: 06/06/2019

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT *Corrected*

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT *Corrected*; Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Frontier Abstract; Filed: 06/05/2019; Received: 06/06/2019

NOTICE OF PENDENCY *Corrected*

NOTICE OF PENDENCY *Corrected*; Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Frontier Abstract; Filed: 06/05/2019; Received: 06/06/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*; Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Frontier Abstract; Filed: 06/05/2019; Received: 06/06/2019

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Filed by CXB - 20191425; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 12/20/2019; Received: 12/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) *Corrected* Filed by CXB - 20191425; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 12/20/2019; Received: 12/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/09/2019; Received: 12/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - - (Motion #1) Supportng Documents; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 10/10/2019; Received: 10/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 10/10/2019; Received: 10/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1); Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 10/10/2019; Received: 10/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 10/10/2019; Received: 10/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Filed by MXT - 20191425; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 10/10/2019; Received: 10/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Homeowner notice 10-16-19, mailed 9-9-19.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/09/2019; Received: 09/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Counsel notice 10-16-19; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/09/2019; Received: 09/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Munian, V. - filed by Class Action LLC; Filed: 06/18/2019; Received: 06/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Munian, V. - filed by Class Action LLC; Filed: 06/18/2019; Received: 06/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Munian, V. - filed by Class Action LLC; Filed: 06/18/2019; Received: 06/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C legal description; Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Frontier Abstract; Filed: 06/06/2019; Received: 06/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Notes; Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Frontier Abstract; Filed: 06/06/2019; Received: 06/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A defendants list; Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Frontier Abstract; Filed: 06/06/2019; Received: 06/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING *Corrected*; Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Frontier Abstract; Filed: 06/05/2019; Received: 06/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT *Corrected*; Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Frontier Abstract; Filed: 06/05/2019; Received: 06/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY *Corrected*; Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Frontier Abstract; Filed: 06/05/2019; Received: 06/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*; Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Frontier Abstract; Filed: 06/05/2019; Received: 06/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less