This case was last updated from Putnam County New York Courts on 01/20/2023 at 05:12:23 (UTC).

M&T Bank v. Alexis C. Devlin et al

Case Summary

On 05/26/2022 M T Bank filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Alexis C Devlin. This case was filed in Putnam County New York Courts, Supreme Court located in Niagara, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Victor G Grossman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2022

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Putnam, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Victor G Grossman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

M&T Bank

Defendants

Alexis C. Devlin

Secretary of Housing and Urban Development

John Doe #1 through #6, and Jane Doe #1 through #6, the last twelve names being fictitious, it being the intention of Plaintiff to designate any and all occupants, tenants, persons or corporations, if any, having or claiming an interest in or lien up

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JACOBS, KYLE JAMES

LIM, CHONG S.

Defendant Attorneys

KOREN, JONATHAN

GURA, JOHN E.

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Lim, C.; Filed: 12/19/2022; Received: 12/19/2022

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/16/2022; Received: 12/16/2022

FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM

FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/14/2022; Received: 12/14/2022

FORECLOSURE COVID-19 CONFERENCE STATUS FORM

FORECLOSURE COVID-19 CONFERENCE STATUS FORM; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/07/2022; Received: 11/07/2022

FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INTAKE FORM

FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INTAKE FORM; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/22/2022; Received: 07/22/2022

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/28/2022; Received: 06/28/2022

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F); Filed By: Lim, C.; Filed: 06/23/2022; Received: 06/23/2022

RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed By: Lim, C.; Filed: 06/23/2022; Received: 06/23/2022

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Gura, J.; Filed: 06/23/2022; Received: 06/23/2022

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Jacobs, K. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 05/26/2022; Received: 05/26/2022

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Jacobs, K. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 05/26/2022; Received: 05/26/2022

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Jacobs, K. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 05/26/2022; Received: 05/26/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - E EXHIBIT E Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - E EXHIBIT E Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jacobs, K. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 05/26/2022; Received: 05/26/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - D EXHIBIT D Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - D EXHIBIT D Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jacobs, K. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 05/26/2022; Received: 05/26/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - c EXHIBIT C Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - c EXHIBIT C Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jacobs, K. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 05/26/2022; Received: 05/26/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - B EXHIBIT B Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - B EXHIBIT B Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jacobs, K. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 05/26/2022; Received: 05/26/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - A EXHIBIT A Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - A EXHIBIT A Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jacobs, K. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 05/26/2022; Received: 05/26/2022

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jacobs, K. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 05/26/2022; Received: 05/26/2022

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Lim, C.; Filed: 12/19/2022; Received: 12/19/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/16/2022; Received: 12/16/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/14/2022; Received: 12/14/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE COVID-19 CONFERENCE STATUS FORM; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/07/2022; Received: 11/07/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INTAKE FORM; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/22/2022; Received: 07/22/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/28/2022; Received: 06/28/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F); Filed By: Lim, C.; Filed: 06/23/2022; Received: 06/23/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed By: Lim, C.; Filed: 06/23/2022; Received: 06/23/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Gura, J.; Filed: 06/23/2022; Received: 06/23/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Koren, J.; Filed: 06/20/2022; Received: 06/20/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT; Filed By: Jacobs, K. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 06/03/2022; Received: 06/03/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Jacobs, K. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 05/26/2022; Received: 05/26/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Jacobs, K. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 05/26/2022; Received: 05/26/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Jacobs, K. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 05/26/2022; Received: 05/26/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E EXHIBIT E Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jacobs, K. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 05/26/2022; Received: 05/26/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D EXHIBIT D Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jacobs, K. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 05/26/2022; Received: 05/26/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - c EXHIBIT C Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jacobs, K. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 05/26/2022; Received: 05/26/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B EXHIBIT B Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jacobs, K. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 05/26/2022; Received: 05/26/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A EXHIBIT A Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jacobs, K. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 05/26/2022; Received: 05/26/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jacobs, K. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 05/26/2022; Received: 05/26/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less