Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 06/26/2020 at 05:17:03 (UTC).

MORAIMA SANTIAGO et al - v. - RIVER MANAGEMENT et al

Case Summary

On 05/30/2017 MORAIMA SANTIAGO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against RIVER MANAGEMENT. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Maria S Vazquezdoles. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2017

  • Filing Date:

    05/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Orange, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Maria S Vazquezdoles

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Moraima Santiago

Anthony Santiago

Defendants

RIVER MANAGEMENT

TOP SEED LANDSCAPE DESIGN, INC.

ASSOCIA NEW YORK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LISSAUER, LAWRENCE D

Attorney at FINKELSTEIN & PARTNERS

Defendant Attorneys

ZIMMERMAN, KEVIN

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH, LLP

APPELBAUM, JOEL R.

Attorney at Joel R. Appelbaum

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service - Order with Notice of Entry

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service - Order with Notice of Entry; Filed By: Appelbaum, J.; Filed: 05/08/2019; Received: 05/08/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY Order with Notice of Entry

NOTICE OF ENTRY Order with Notice of Entry; Filed By: Appelbaum, J.; Filed: 05/08/2019; Received: 05/08/2019

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1)

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/15/2019; Received: 03/15/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #1) Reply Affirmation

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #1) Reply Affirmation; Filed By: Appelbaum, J.; Filed: 12/20/2018; Received: 12/20/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1) Authorization to efile

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1) Authorization to efile; Filed By: Lissauer, L. - filed by Finkelstein & Partners, LLP; Filed: 12/17/2018; Received: 12/17/2018

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #1) Affirmation in Opposition

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #1) Affirmation in Opposition; Filed By: Lissauer, L. - filed by Finkelstein & Partners, LLP; Filed: 12/17/2018; Received: 12/17/2018

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/11/2018; Received: 12/11/2018

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service of Notice of Motion

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service of Notice of Motion; Filed By: Appelbaum, J.; Filed: 12/11/2018; Received: 12/11/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - P (Motion #1) Snow Removal Procedure - Plaintff's Exhibit 9

EXHIBIT(S) - P (Motion #1) Snow Removal Procedure - Plaintff's Exhibit 9; Filed By: Appelbaum, J.; Filed: 12/11/2018; Received: 12/11/2018

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Appelbaum, J.; Filed: 09/11/2017; Received: 09/11/2017

ADMISSION OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Answer with Cross-Claims

ADMISSION OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Answer with Cross-Claims; Filed By: Zimmerman, K.; Filed: 08/09/2017; Received: 08/09/2017

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Answer with Cross-Claims

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Answer with Cross-Claims; Filed By: Zimmerman, K.; Filed: 08/09/2017; Received: 08/09/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of S&C and Notice of Commencement of Action Subject to Efiling on deft Associa ... show more

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of S&C and Notice of Commencement of Action Subject to Efiling on deft Associa ... show more; Filed By: Lissauer, L. - filed by D'Onofrio, L.; Filed: 07/07/2017; Received: 07/07/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of S&C and Notice of Commencement of Action Subject to Efiling on deft River Ma ... show more

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of S&C and Notice of Commencement of Action Subject to Efiling on deft River Ma ... show more; Filed By: Lissauer, L. - filed by D'Onofrio, L.; Filed: 07/07/2017; Received: 07/07/2017

ANSWER Answer of Top Seed Landscape Design, Inc.

ANSWER Answer of Top Seed Landscape Design, Inc.; Filed By: Appelbaum, J.; Filed: 06/23/2017; Received: 06/23/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of S&C and Notice of Commencement of Action Subject to Efiling on deft Top Seed ... show more

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of S&C and Notice of Commencement of Action Subject to Efiling on deft Top Seed ... show more; Filed By: Lissauer, L. - filed by D'Onofrio, L.; Filed: 06/19/2017; Received: 06/19/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Statement of Authorization for Efiling, dated May 30, 2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Statement of Authorization for Efiling, dated May 30, 2017; Filed By: Lissauer, L. - filed by D'Onofrio, L.; Filed: 05/30/2017; Received: 05/30/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Complaint, dated May 30, 2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Complaint, dated May 30, 2017; Filed By: Lissauer, L. - filed by D'Onofrio, L.; Filed: 05/30/2017; Received: 05/30/2017

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service - Order with Notice of Entry; Filed By: Appelbaum, J.; Filed: 05/08/2019; Received: 05/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY Order with Notice of Entry; Filed By: Appelbaum, J.; Filed: 05/08/2019; Received: 05/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/15/2019; Received: 03/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #1) Reply Affirmation; Filed By: Appelbaum, J.; Filed: 12/20/2018; Received: 12/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1) Authorization to efile; Filed By: Lissauer, L. - filed by Finkelstein & Partners, LLP; Filed: 12/17/2018; Received: 12/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #1) Affirmation in Opposition; Filed By: Lissauer, L. - filed by Finkelstein & Partners, LLP; Filed: 12/17/2018; Received: 12/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/11/2018; Received: 12/11/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service of Notice of Motion; Filed By: Appelbaum, J.; Filed: 12/11/2018; Received: 12/11/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - P (Motion #1) Snow Removal Procedure - Plaintff's Exhibit 9; Filed By: Appelbaum, J.; Filed: 12/11/2018; Received: 12/11/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - O (Motion #1) Plaintiff's Exhibit 7; Filed By: Appelbaum, J.; Filed: 12/11/2018; Received: 12/11/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 09/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/15/2017; Received: 09/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Appelbaum, J.; Filed: 09/11/2017; Received: 09/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADMISSION OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Answer with Cross-Claims; Filed By: Zimmerman, K.; Filed: 08/09/2017; Received: 08/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Answer with Cross-Claims; Filed By: Zimmerman, K.; Filed: 08/09/2017; Received: 08/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of S&C and Notice of Commencement of Action Subject to Efiling on deft Associa New York; Filed By: Lissauer, L. - filed by D'Onofrio, L.; Filed: 07/07/2017; Received: 07/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of S&C and Notice of Commencement of Action Subject to Efiling on deft River Management; Filed By: Lissauer, L. - filed by D'Onofrio, L.; Filed: 07/07/2017; Received: 07/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Answer of Top Seed Landscape Design, Inc.; Filed By: Appelbaum, J.; Filed: 06/23/2017; Received: 06/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of S&C and Notice of Commencement of Action Subject to Efiling on deft Top Seed Landscape Design, Inc.; Filed By: Lissauer, L. - filed by D'Onofrio, L.; Filed: 06/19/2017; Received: 06/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Statement of Authorization for Efiling, dated May 30, 2017; Filed By: Lissauer, L. - filed by D'Onofrio, L.; Filed: 05/30/2017; Received: 05/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Complaint, dated May 30, 2017; Filed By: Lissauer, L. - filed by D'Onofrio, L.; Filed: 05/30/2017; Received: 05/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less