This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 01:52:32 (UTC).

MOOSA ABDULLA - v. - NOUVEAU ELEVATOR INDUSTRIES, INC.,

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 MOOSA ABDULLA filed an Other lawsuit against NOUVEAU ELEVATOR INDUSTRIES, INC . This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Moosa Abdulla

Defendant

NOUVEAU ELEVATOR INDUSTRIES, INC.,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

STOLZENBERG, HOWARD B

Attorney at STOLZENBERGCORTELLI, LLP.

CORTELLI, TERRENCE JAMES

Attorney at StolzenbergCortelli, LLP.

Defendant Attorney

VERDIRAME, PETER J.

Attorney at Law offices of Peter J. Verdirame

 

Court Documents

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Cortelli, T. - filed by StolzenbergCortelli, LLP.; Filed: 09/14/2017; Received: 09/14/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Cortelli, T. - filed by J&E Filed: 07/06/2017; Received: 07/06/2017

DEMAND FOR: ADDITIONAL DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY & INSPECTION

DEMAND FOR: ADDITIONAL DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY & INSPECTION; Filed By: Cortelli, T. - filed by StolzenbergCortelli, LLP.; Filed: 05/15/2019; Received: 05/15/2019

ORDER - OTHER Dated 05/11/2018

ORDER - OTHER Dated 05/11/2018; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/16/2018; Received: 05/17/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Cortelli, T. - filed by J&E Filed: 07/06/2017; Received: 07/06/2017

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE Central Compliance Part Conference - dated 1/17/20

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE Central Compliance Part Conference - dated 1/17/20; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/22/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Cortelli, T. - filed by StolzenbergCortelli, LLP.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

BILL OF PARTICULARS SUPPLEMENTAL VERIFIED BILL OF PARTICULARS

BILL OF PARTICULARS SUPPLEMENTAL VERIFIED BILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Cortelli, T. - filed by StolzenbergCortelli, LLP.; Filed: 08/20/2019; Received: 08/20/2019

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Verdirame, P.; Filed: 05/15/2019; Received: 05/15/2019

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated 11/28/2017

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated 11/28/2017; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/05/2018; Received: 01/05/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Stolzenberg, H. - filed by StolzenbergCortelli, LLP.; Filed: 11/18/2019; Received: 11/18/2019

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE order dtd 10/3/2019

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE order dtd 10/3/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/07/2019; Received: 10/08/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Cortelli, T. - filed by StolzenbergCortelli, LLP.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1) dtd 6/14/2019

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1) dtd 6/14/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/21/2019; Received: 06/25/2019

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Cortelli, T. - filed by StolzenbergCortelli, LLP.; Filed: 09/14/2017; Received: 09/14/2017

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Verdirame, P.; Filed: 08/22/2017; Received: 08/22/2017

BILL OF PARTICULARS SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL BILL OF PARTICULARS

BILL OF PARTICULARS SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL BILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Stolzenberg, H. - filed by StolzenbergCortelli, LLP.; Filed: 11/18/2019; Received: 11/18/2019

NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION NOTICE OF SUBPOENA

NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION NOTICE OF SUBPOENA; Filed By: Cortelli, T. - filed by StolzenbergCortelli, LLP.; Filed: 11/27/2019; Received: 11/27/2019

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE Central Compliance Part Conference - dated 1/17/20; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/22/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION NOTICE OF SUBPOENA; Filed By: Cortelli, T. - filed by StolzenbergCortelli, LLP.; Filed: 11/27/2019; Received: 11/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Stolzenberg, H. - filed by StolzenbergCortelli, LLP.; Filed: 11/18/2019; Received: 11/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBILL OF PARTICULARS SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL BILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Stolzenberg, H. - filed by StolzenbergCortelli, LLP.; Filed: 11/18/2019; Received: 11/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE order dtd 10/3/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/07/2019; Received: 10/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBILL OF PARTICULARS SUPPLEMENTAL VERIFIED BILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Cortelli, T. - filed by StolzenbergCortelli, LLP.; Filed: 08/20/2019; Received: 08/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER (Motion #1) dtd 6/14/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/21/2019; Received: 06/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Verdirame, P.; Filed: 05/15/2019; Received: 05/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: ADDITIONAL DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY & INSPECTION; Filed By: Cortelli, T. - filed by StolzenbergCortelli, LLP.; Filed: 05/15/2019; Received: 05/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Cortelli, T. - filed by StolzenbergCortelli, LLP.; Filed: 04/12/2019; Received: 04/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Additional Discovery Demands; Filed By: Cortelli, T. - filed by StolzenbergCortelli, LLP.; Filed: 07/31/2018; Received: 07/31/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER Dated 05/11/2018; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/16/2018; Received: 05/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated 11/28/2017; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/05/2018; Received: 01/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Cortelli, T. - filed by StolzenbergCortelli, LLP.; Filed: 09/14/2017; Received: 09/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Cortelli, T. - filed by StolzenbergCortelli, LLP.; Filed: 09/14/2017; Received: 09/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Verdirame, P.; Filed: 08/22/2017; Received: 08/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Cortelli, T. - filed by J&E Filed: 07/06/2017; Received: 07/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Cortelli, T. - filed by J&E Filed: 07/06/2017; Received: 07/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Cortelli, T. - filed by StolzenbergCortelli, LLP.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Cortelli, T. - filed by StolzenbergCortelli, LLP.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less