This case was last updated from Onondaga County Courts on 02/25/2020 at 13:15:03 (UTC).

Monica A. Egnaczyk v. Sean C. Gayle et al

Case Summary

On 03/27/2019 Monica A Egnaczyk filed an Other lawsuit against Sean C Gayle. This case was filed in Onondaga County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Onondaga County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Onondaga, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Monica A. Egnaczyk

Defendants

Sean C. Gayle

U.S. Xpress, Inc. d/b/a U.S. Xpress of New York

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

PORTER, MICHAEL SCOTT

Attorney at Porter NordbyHowe

NORDBY, ERIC C

Attorney at Porter Nordby Howe LLP

Defendant Attorney

SCHIFFRIK, AARON MICHAEL

Attorney at Goldberg Segalla, LLP

 

Court Documents

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Nordby, E.; Filed: 02/19/2020; Received: 02/19/2020

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Nordby, E.; Filed: 02/18/2020; Received: 02/18/2020

ORDER - OTHER

ORDER - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/12/2020; Received: 02/11/2020

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Proposed Stipulated Protective Order

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Proposed Stipulated Protective Order; Filed By: Schiffrik, A.; Filed: 01/28/2020; Received: 01/28/2020

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Received: 11/08/2019

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED)

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED); Filed By: Porter, M.; Filed: 11/04/2019; Received: 11/04/2019

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Porter, M.; Filed: 10/18/2019; Received: 10/18/2019

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Preliminary Conference scheduled for October 21, 2019.

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Preliminary Conference scheduled for October 21, 2019.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/07/2019; Received: 10/07/2019

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Porter, M.; Filed: 09/24/2019; Received: 09/24/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Schiffrik, A.; Filed: 07/31/2019; Received: 07/31/2019

ANSWER Verified Answer

ANSWER Verified Answer; Filed By: Schiffrik, A.; Filed: 07/31/2019; Received: 07/31/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS of Summons & Complaint on US Xpress through Secretary of State

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS of Summons & Complaint on US Xpress through Secretary of State; Filed By: Porter, M.; Filed: 07/08/2019; Received: 07/08/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS of Summons & Complaint on Gayle

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS of Summons & Complaint on Gayle; Filed By: Porter, M.; Filed: 07/02/2019; Received: 07/02/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Complaint

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Complaint; Filed By: Porter, M.; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Nordby, E.; Filed: 02/19/2020; Received: 02/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Nordby, E.; Filed: 02/18/2020; Received: 02/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/12/2020; Received: 02/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) Proposed Stipulated Protective Order; Filed By: Schiffrik, A.; Filed: 01/28/2020; Received: 01/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Received: 11/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED); Filed By: Porter, M.; Filed: 11/04/2019; Received: 11/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Porter, M.; Filed: 10/18/2019; Received: 10/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Preliminary Conference scheduled for October 21, 2019.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/07/2019; Received: 10/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Porter, M.; Filed: 09/24/2019; Received: 09/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Schiffrik, A.; Filed: 07/31/2019; Received: 07/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Verified Answer; Filed By: Schiffrik, A.; Filed: 07/31/2019; Received: 07/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS of Summons & Complaint on US Xpress through Secretary of State; Filed By: Porter, M.; Filed: 07/08/2019; Received: 07/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS of Summons & Complaint on Gayle; Filed By: Porter, M.; Filed: 07/02/2019; Received: 07/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Complaint; Filed By: Porter, M.; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less