This case was last updated from Ontario County Courts on 02/21/2020 at 22:08:31 (UTC).

ML FACTORS FUNDING LLC v. MIDMO TRUCKING LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/29/2019 ML FACTORS FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MIDMO TRUCKING LLC. This case was filed in Ontario County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Ontario County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Ontario, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ML FACTORS FUNDING LLC

Defendants

T AND T HEATING AND COOLING

SPOTLIGHT RECOVERY SERVICES LLC

OZARK FIELD SERVICES LLC

FIRST CHOICE SATELLITE SERVICE

Scott Thurmond

MIDMO TRUCKING LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FOGEL, DAVID

Attorney at David Fogel P.C.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY

NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Fogel, D.; Filed: 03/22/2019; Received: 03/22/2019

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/01/2019; Received: 02/04/2019

JUDGMENT BY CONFESSION (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT BY CONFESSION (PROPOSED); Filed By: Fogel, D.; Filed: 01/29/2019; Received: 01/29/2019

AFFIDAVIT Plaintiff's Supporting Affidavit

AFFIDAVIT Plaintiff's Supporting Affidavit; Filed By: Fogel, D.; Filed: 01/29/2019; Received: 01/29/2019

CONFESSION OF JUDGMENT (AFFIDAVIT OF DEFENDANT)

CONFESSION OF JUDGMENT (AFFIDAVIT OF DEFENDANT); Filed By: Fogel, D.; Filed: 01/29/2019; Received: 01/29/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Fogel, D.; Filed: 03/22/2019; Received: 03/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/01/2019; Received: 02/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT BY CONFESSION (PROPOSED); Filed By: Fogel, D.; Filed: 01/29/2019; Received: 01/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Plaintiff's Supporting Affidavit; Filed By: Fogel, D.; Filed: 01/29/2019; Received: 01/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFESSION OF JUDGMENT (AFFIDAVIT OF DEFENDANT); Filed By: Fogel, D.; Filed: 01/29/2019; Received: 01/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less