This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 02:07:17 (UTC).

Mirna E El Kadamani - v. - T & E Stores, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 Mirna E El Kadamani filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against T E Stores, Inc. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mirna E El kadamani

Defendants

Joan-Lin Corp.

Telco of 67th LLC

T & E Stores, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LEVINSKY, ANATTA

Attorney at Law Offices of Anatta Leviinsky, P.C,

GALLET, REGIS A.

Attorney at Law Offices of Regis A. Gallet

Defendant Attorneys

O'DONNELL, MARK PATRICK

Attorney at Foran Glennon Palandech Ponzi & Rudloff PCq

AHDOOT, REBECCA

Attorney at Zetlin & De Chiara LLP

TEITZ, COREY PATRICK

Attorney at Foran Glennon Palandech Ponzi & Rudloff, P.C.

SZALYGA, JOSEPH W

Attorney at FORAN GLENNON PALANDECH PONZI & RUDLOFF

 

Court Documents

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/23/2019; Received: 12/24/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #5) BP

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #5) BP; Filed By: O'Donnell, M.; Filed: 12/13/2019; Received: 12/13/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #5) Email Correspondence

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #5) Email Correspondence; Filed By: O'Donnell, M.; Filed: 12/13/2019; Received: 12/13/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #5) 11/19/19 Letter

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #5) 11/19/19 Letter; Filed By: O'Donnell, M.; Filed: 12/13/2019; Received: 12/13/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #5) Post Deposition Demands

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #5) Post Deposition Demands; Filed By: O'Donnell, M.; Filed: 12/13/2019; Received: 12/13/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #5) Final Pre-Note Order

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #5) Final Pre-Note Order; Filed By: O'Donnell, M.; Filed: 12/13/2019; Received: 12/13/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #5)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #5); Filed By: O'Donnell, M.; Filed: 12/13/2019; Received: 12/13/2019

AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH (Motion #5)

AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH (Motion #5); Filed By: O'Donnell, M.; Filed: 12/13/2019; Received: 12/13/2019

NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #5)

NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #5); Filed By: O'Donnell, M.; Filed: 12/13/2019; Received: 12/13/2019

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Ahdoot, R.; Filed: 12/12/2017; Received: 12/12/2017

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI)

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI); Filed By: Ahdoot, R.; Filed: 10/17/2017; Received: 10/17/2017

DEMAND FOR: combined discovery demands

DEMAND FOR: combined discovery demands; Filed By: Drossman, D.; Filed: 09/28/2017; Received: 09/28/2017

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Drossman, D.; Filed: 09/28/2017; Received: 09/28/2017

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Drossman, D.; Filed: 09/28/2017; Received: 09/28/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Levinsky, A.; Filed: 09/12/2017; Received: 09/12/2017

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION; Filed By: Ahdoot, R.; Filed: 09/06/2017; Received: 09/06/2017

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Ahdoot, R.; Filed: 09/06/2017; Received: 09/06/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Levinsky, A.; Filed: 08/10/2017; Received: 08/10/2017

49 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/23/2019; Received: 12/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #5) BP; Filed By: O'Donnell, M.; Filed: 12/13/2019; Received: 12/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #5) Email Correspondence; Filed By: O'Donnell, M.; Filed: 12/13/2019; Received: 12/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #5) 11/19/19 Letter; Filed By: O'Donnell, M.; Filed: 12/13/2019; Received: 12/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #5) Post Deposition Demands; Filed By: O'Donnell, M.; Filed: 12/13/2019; Received: 12/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #5) Final Pre-Note Order; Filed By: O'Donnell, M.; Filed: 12/13/2019; Received: 12/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #5); Filed By: O'Donnell, M.; Filed: 12/13/2019; Received: 12/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH (Motion #5); Filed By: O'Donnell, M.; Filed: 12/13/2019; Received: 12/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #5); Filed By: O'Donnell, M.; Filed: 12/13/2019; Received: 12/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #3) 11-26-19 E-Mail Correspondences; Filed By: Gallet, R.; Filed: 12/02/2019; Received: 12/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 12/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Ahdoot, R.; Filed: 12/12/2017; Received: 12/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI); Filed By: Ahdoot, R.; Filed: 10/17/2017; Received: 10/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: combined discovery demands; Filed By: Drossman, D.; Filed: 09/28/2017; Received: 09/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Drossman, D.; Filed: 09/28/2017; Received: 09/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Drossman, D.; Filed: 09/28/2017; Received: 09/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Levinsky, A.; Filed: 09/12/2017; Received: 09/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION; Filed By: Ahdoot, R.; Filed: 09/06/2017; Received: 09/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Ahdoot, R.; Filed: 09/06/2017; Received: 09/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Levinsky, A.; Filed: 08/10/2017; Received: 08/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Un-Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Levinsky, A.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less