This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 01:56:54 (UTC).

MIRIAM HERNANDEZ - v. - FRANK PIRRONE

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 MIRIAM HERNANDEZ filed an Other lawsuit against FRANK PIRRONE. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Miriam Hernandez

Defendant

Frank Pirrone

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HIRSCHHORN, ANDREW

Attorney at Law Office of Andrew J. Hirschhorn

ABRAHAM, IRWIN D

Attorney at ABRAHAM AND ABRAHAM ATTORNEYS AND COUNSELORS AT LAW, LLC

Defendant Attorney

TOOMEY, JAMES J

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF JAMES J. TOOMEY

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Hirschhorn, A. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

ANSWER Answer & Discovery Demands

ANSWER Answer & Discovery Demands; Filed By: Toomey, J.; Filed: 07/26/2017; Received: 07/26/2017

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance; Filed By: Toomey, J.; Filed: 10/09/2017; Received: 10/09/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Hirschhorn, A. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Abraham, I. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 06/12/2017; Received: 06/12/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Abraham, I. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 06/12/2017; Received: 06/12/2017

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance; Filed By: Toomey, J.; Filed: 10/09/2017; Received: 10/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Answer & Discovery Demands; Filed By: Toomey, J.; Filed: 07/26/2017; Received: 07/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Abraham, I. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 06/12/2017; Received: 06/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Abraham, I. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 06/12/2017; Received: 06/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Hirschhorn, A. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Hirschhorn, A. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less