This case was last updated from Livingston County Courts on 02/17/2020 at 19:20:37 (UTC).

Mill Creek, LLC - v. - Assessor, Town of North Dansville et al

Case Summary

On 07/06/2017 Mill Creek, LLC filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against Assessor, Town of North Dansville. This case was filed in Livingston County Courts, Supreme Court located in Orange, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Livingston, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mill Creek, LLC

Defendants

Town of North Dansville

Board of Assessment Review for the Town of North Dansville

Assessor, Town of North Dansville

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SPENO, REBECCA MICHELE

Defendant Attorney

PUTNEY, JOHN C.

 

Court Documents

PETITION

PETITION; Filed By: Speno, R.; Filed: 07/06/2017; Received: 07/06/2017

NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S)

NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S); Filed By: Speno, R.; Filed: 07/06/2017; Received: 07/06/2017

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION; Filed By: Speno, R.; Filed: 07/06/2017; Received: 07/06/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Speno, R.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Speno, R.; Filed: 07/25/2017; Received: 07/25/2017

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/14/2018; Received: 06/14/2018

STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER - For His Honor's review

STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER - For His Honor's review; Filed By: Speno, R.; Filed: 06/28/2018; Received: 06/28/2018

ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING

ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/09/2018; Received: 07/09/2018

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/14/2019; Received: 01/14/2019

ORDER - OTHER Stipulation of Settlement and Judicial Order

ORDER - OTHER Stipulation of Settlement and Judicial Order; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/10/2019; Received: 05/10/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER Stipulation of Settlement and Judicial Order; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/10/2019; Received: 05/10/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/14/2019; Received: 01/14/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - CASE SCHEDULING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/09/2018; Received: 07/09/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER - For His Honor's review; Filed By: Speno, R.; Filed: 06/28/2018; Received: 06/28/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/14/2018; Received: 06/14/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Speno, R.; Filed: 07/25/2017; Received: 07/25/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Speno, R.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION; Filed By: Speno, R.; Filed: 07/06/2017; Received: 07/06/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S); Filed By: Speno, R.; Filed: 07/06/2017; Received: 07/06/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION; Filed By: Speno, R.; Filed: 07/06/2017; Received: 07/06/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less