This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/09/2020 at 01:30:35 (UTC).

MIGUEL MOULTON - v. - URAL B. MARTIN

Case Summary

On 05/12/2017 MIGUEL MOULTON filed an Other lawsuit against URAL B MARTIN. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Miguel Moulton

Defendant

Ural B. Martin

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RYNECKI, SCOTT E

Attorney at RUBENSTEIN & RYNECKI ESQS

Defendant Attorneys

FLANAGAN, JAMES ROBERT

Attorney at ABAMONT & ASSOCIATES

FISHKIN, ROBERT ADAM

Attorney at Fishkin & Associates

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Fishkin, R. - filed by FISHKIN & ASSOCIATES; Filed: 01/16/2020; Received: 01/16/2020

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Fishkin, R. - filed by FISHKIN & ASSOCIATES; Filed: 01/16/2020; Received: 01/16/2020

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/12/2018; Received: 12/13/2018

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #2) Possible SSN Administratively Redacted

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #2) Possible SSN Administratively Redacted; Filed By: Flanagan, J. - filed by KATZ & ASSOCIATES; Filed: 12/05/2018; Received: 12/05/2018

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #3)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #3); Filed By: Flanagan, J. - filed by KATZ & ASSOCIATES; Filed: 12/04/2018; Received: 12/04/2018

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #2) Affidavit of Service

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #2) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Rynecki, S.; Filed: 11/14/2018; Received: 11/14/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - 8 (Motion #2) Exhibit 8 - Response to D&I dated 11-12-18 Possible SSN Administratively Redacted

EXHIBIT(S) - 8 (Motion #2) Exhibit 8 - Response to D&I dated 11-12-18 Possible SSN Administratively Redacted; Filed By: Rynecki, S.; Filed: 11/14/2018; Received: 11/14/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - 7 (Motion #2) Exhibit 7 - Pltf's Notice of Motion to Strike dated 11-12-18

EXHIBIT(S) - 7 (Motion #2) Exhibit 7 - Pltf's Notice of Motion to Strike dated 11-12-18; Filed By: Rynecki, S.; Filed: 11/14/2018; Received: 11/14/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - 6 (Motion #2) Exhibit 6 - Note of Issue

EXHIBIT(S) - 6 (Motion #2) Exhibit 6 - Note of Issue; Filed By: Rynecki, S.; Filed: 11/14/2018; Received: 11/14/2018

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion; Filed By: Rynecki, S.; Filed: 08/13/2018; Received: 08/13/2018

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/15/2018; Received: 03/19/2018

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated 10/06/2017

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated 10/06/2017; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/11/2017; Received: 10/23/2017

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL INTERVENTION

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL INTERVENTION; Filed By: Rynecki, S.; Filed: 08/11/2017; Received: 08/11/2017

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit for service of the Summons & Complaint

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit for service of the Summons & Complaint; Filed By: Rynecki, S.; Filed: 08/08/2017; Received: 08/08/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A Ex. to Answer - Client Verification

EXHIBIT(S) - A Ex. to Answer - Client Verification; Filed By: Simuro, A. - filed by Fishkin & Associates; Filed: 08/01/2017; Received: 08/01/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Simuro, A. - filed by Fishkin & Associates; Filed: 07/13/2017; Received: 07/13/2017

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Simuro, A. - filed by Fishkin & Associates; Filed: 07/13/2017; Received: 07/13/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Rynecki, S.; Filed: 05/12/2017; Received: 05/12/2017

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Fishkin, R. - filed by FISHKIN & ASSOCIATES; Filed: 01/16/2020; Received: 01/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Fishkin, R. - filed by FISHKIN & ASSOCIATES; Filed: 01/16/2020; Received: 01/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/12/2018; Received: 12/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #2) Possible SSN Administratively Redacted; Filed By: Flanagan, J. - filed by KATZ & ASSOCIATES; Filed: 12/05/2018; Received: 12/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #3); Filed By: Flanagan, J. - filed by KATZ & ASSOCIATES; Filed: 12/04/2018; Received: 12/04/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #2) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Rynecki, S.; Filed: 11/14/2018; Received: 11/14/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 8 (Motion #2) Exhibit 8 - Response to D&I dated 11-12-18 Possible SSN Administratively Redacted; Filed By: Rynecki, S.; Filed: 11/14/2018; Received: 11/14/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 7 (Motion #2) Exhibit 7 - Pltf's Notice of Motion to Strike dated 11-12-18; Filed By: Rynecki, S.; Filed: 11/14/2018; Received: 11/14/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 6 (Motion #2) Exhibit 6 - Note of Issue; Filed By: Rynecki, S.; Filed: 11/14/2018; Received: 11/14/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 5 (Motion #2) Exhibit 5 - Final Pre-Note Order dated 10-03-18; Filed By: Rynecki, S.; Filed: 11/14/2018; Received: 11/14/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1) Affirmation in Support; Filed By: Rynecki, S.; Filed: 08/13/2018; Received: 08/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion; Filed By: Rynecki, S.; Filed: 08/13/2018; Received: 08/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/15/2018; Received: 03/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated 10/06/2017; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/11/2017; Received: 10/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL INTERVENTION; Filed By: Rynecki, S.; Filed: 08/11/2017; Received: 08/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit for service of the Summons & Complaint; Filed By: Rynecki, S.; Filed: 08/08/2017; Received: 08/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Ex. to Answer - Client Verification; Filed By: Simuro, A. - filed by Fishkin & Associates; Filed: 08/01/2017; Received: 08/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Simuro, A. - filed by Fishkin & Associates; Filed: 07/13/2017; Received: 07/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Simuro, A. - filed by Fishkin & Associates; Filed: 07/13/2017; Received: 07/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Rynecki, S.; Filed: 05/12/2017; Received: 05/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less