This case was last updated from Tompkins County Courts on 02/26/2020 at 00:44:22 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC v. William Sickmon

Case Summary

On 04/09/2019 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against William Sickmon. This case was filed in Tompkins County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0221

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tompkins County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Tompkins, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

William Sickmon

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EINSTEIN, STEPHEN

Attorney at STEPHEN EINSTEIN & ASSOCIATES P.C.

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/25/2019; Received: 09/25/2019

ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT

ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/24/2019; Received: 09/24/2019

AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 07/18/2019; Received: 07/18/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 07/18/2019; Received: 07/18/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 07/18/2019; Received: 07/18/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 07/18/2019; Received: 07/18/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 07/18/2019; Received: 07/18/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 07/18/2019; Received: 07/18/2019

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) SEA#308250

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) SEA#308250; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 07/18/2019; Received: 07/18/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Einstein, S. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 05/13/2019; Received: 05/13/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Einstein, S. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 04/09/2019; Received: 04/09/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Einstein, S. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 04/09/2019; Received: 04/09/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/25/2019; Received: 09/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/24/2019; Received: 09/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 07/18/2019; Received: 07/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 07/18/2019; Received: 07/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 07/18/2019; Received: 07/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 07/18/2019; Received: 07/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 07/18/2019; Received: 07/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 07/18/2019; Received: 07/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) SEA#308250; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 07/18/2019; Received: 07/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Einstein, S. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 05/13/2019; Received: 05/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Einstein, S. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 04/09/2019; Received: 04/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Einstein, S. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 04/09/2019; Received: 04/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less